This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2022 at 06:16:45 (UTC).

Laphill Knox v. RentGrow, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 Laphill Knox filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against RentGrow, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jesus G. Bernal, Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01871

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judges

Jesus G. Bernal

Sunshine Suzanne Sykes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laphill Knox

Defendant

RentGrow, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph L. Gentilcore

Attorney at Francis Mailman Soumilas PC

1600 Market Street, Suite 2510

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Stephanie R. Tatar

Attorney at Tatar Law Firm APC

3500 West Olive Avenue Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91505

Defendant Attorneys

Bonnie Keane DelGobbo

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

One North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

Amy Lynn Lenz

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

1 North Upper Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

Ryan David Fischbach

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: FCRA consumer reporting. Filed by Defendant RentGrow, Inc.(Lenz, Amy) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#36

(#36) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

#35

(#35) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/4/2023. (shb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#34

(#34) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Amended Pleadings due by September 12, 2022., Discovery cut-off April 24, 2023., Exhibit List due by September 1, 2023., Witness List due by September 1, 2023., Motions in Limine to be filed by August 18, 2023., Status Report due by September 1, 2023., Last date to conduct settlement conference is August 4, 2023., Final Pretrial Conference set for September 29, 2023 at 1:00 p.m., Jury Trial set for October 16, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Any request for continuance of trial must be filed no later than one (1) week prior to the Final Pretrial Conference. Requests extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#33

(#33) Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox (Gentilcore, Joseph) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#32

(#32) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

#31

(#31) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-102) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01871-SSS-SPx. (ap) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#30

(#30) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/22/2023. (mga) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#29

(#29) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2022. Discovery cut-off 4/24/2023. Motions cut-off 7/10/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/22/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (mga) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RentGrow, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#4

(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox, (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RentGrow, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties request that the ADR Program assign a Panel Mediator from the following area of law: FCRA consumer reporting. Filed by Defendant RentGrow, Inc.(Lenz, Amy) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) (Entered: 08/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 8/4/2023. (shb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Amended Pleadings due by September 12, 2022., Discovery cut-off April 24, 2023., Exhibit List due by September 1, 2023., Witness List due by September 1, 2023., Motions in Limine to be filed by August 18, 2023., Status Report due by September 1, 2023., Last date to conduct settlement conference is August 4, 2023., Final Pretrial Conference set for September 29, 2023 at 1:00 p.m., Jury Trial set for October 16, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Any request for continuance of trial must be filed no later than one (1) week prior to the Final Pretrial Conference. Requests extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. See order for more information. (shb) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox (Gentilcore, Joseph) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Please refer to Order for complete details., (iva) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#22-102) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Sykes, Sunshine Suzanne, this case is transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to the calendar of Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:21-cv-01871-SSS-SPx. (ap) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/22/2023. (mga) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2022. Discovery cut-off 4/24/2023. Motions cut-off 7/10/2023. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 5/22/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2023 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (mga) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #25 Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie Keane DelGobbo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of RentGrow, Inc, designating Ryan D. Fischbach as local counsel. ; granting #27 Non-Resident Attorney Bonnie Keane DelGobbo APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of RentGrow, Inc, designating Ryan D. Fischbach as local counsel. (twdb) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox, upon Defendant RentGrow, Inc. served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Lawyers, authorized agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant RentGrow, Inc. (jtil) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox, (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox. (Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32272240 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Laphill Knox. (Attorney Stephanie R. Tatar added to party Laphill Knox(pty:pla))(Tatar, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rentgrow, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Lynn Lenz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan David Fischbach

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bonnie Keane DelGobbo