This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:17:59 (UTC).

Danny Lantan v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Danny Lantan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II and Alka Sagar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10305

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Lantan

Defendants

FCA US LLC

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kevin A Alexander, II

Attorney at Law Offices of William R McGee APLC

701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92011

William R McGee

Attorney at William McGee Law Offices

701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Deanna M Wallace

Attorney at Law Office of William R McGee

701 Palomar Airport Road Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92011

Defendant Attorneys

Erin Elizabeth Hanson

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

One America Plaza, 600 West Broadway Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101

Cindy Ariel Kaoud

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 West 7Th Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Roger G Perkins

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

One America Plaza, 600 West Broadway Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101

Penelope M Deihl

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 West Seventh Street 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2503

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Complaint

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 3/30/20 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#3

(#3) DECLARATION of Erin E. Hanson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - RISC)(Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #5

Exhibit E - State Court POS of Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Summons

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Penelope M Deihl counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Penelope M. Deihl as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Penelope M Deihl added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Deihl, Penelope) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#8

(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D - State Court Ntc of Case Assignment

3 #2

Exhibit 2 - RISC

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV39264 Receipt No: 0973-24894928 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Ntc of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - State Court POS of Summons) (Attorney Erin Elizabeth Hanson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Ariel Kaoud counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Cindy A. Kaoud as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Cindy Ariel Kaoud added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Kaoud, Cindy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., FCA North America Holdings LLC. (Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of James Sheridan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Penelope M Deihl counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Penelope M. Deihl as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Penelope M Deihl added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Deihl, Penelope) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Cindy Ariel Kaoud counsel for Defendant FCA US LLC. Adding Cindy A. Kaoud as counsel of record for FCA US LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attorney Cindy Ariel Kaoud added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Kaoud, Cindy) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 3/30/20 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing onthe voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY PROOF OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Danny Lantan, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Agent for CT Corp in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/5/2019 Submitted with Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, FCA US LLC., filed by Plaintiff Danny Lantan. Filed in State Court on 11/1/19 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, identifying Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V., FCA North America Holdings LLC. (Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of James Sheridan re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Erin E. Hanson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - RISC)(Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV39264 Receipt No: 0973-24894928 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Ntc of Case Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - State Court POS of Summons) (Attorney Erin Elizabeth Hanson added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hanson, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.