This case was last updated from PACER on 11/04/2019 at 08:21:58 (UTC).

Lansdon et al v. Waddell

Case Summary

On 09/05/2019 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by Lansdon against Waddell in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00789

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judges

Joe Brown

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Lansdon

Gayle Lansdon

Defendant

Carmon Waddell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Glenda Hawkins Pipkin

Attorney at Law Office of Glenda Hawkins

P.O. Box 10301

Murfreesboro, TN 37129

Defendant Attorneys

Danica Renee Grosko

Attorney at LeVan, Sprader, Patton & Plymire

201 4Th Avenue North, Suite 1500

Nashville, TN 37219

Paul L. Sprader

Attorney at LeVan, Sprader, Patton, Plymire & Offutt

201 Fourth Avenue North, Suite 1500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) RECEIPT #34675056212 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Carmon Waddell re #1 Notice of Removal,. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER: Defendant's unopposed Motion to Consolidate this matter with case 3:19-cv-00660 ( #6 ) for all issues in these actions including discovery and trial due to their common questions of fact and law from the same accident, involving the same vehicles and accident witnesses, is GRANTED. This case is transferred to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/1/19. (gb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Carmon Waddell. (Sprader, Paul) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Filing

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/10/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carmon Waddell from Circuit Court for Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 76185. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34675056212) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C- Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • All future filings in this case should be made in the lead case 3:19-cv-660. (gb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER: Defendant's unopposed Motion to Consolidate this matter with case 3:19-cv-00660 ( #6 ) for all issues in these actions including discovery and trial due to their common questions of fact and law from the same accident, involving the same vehicles and accident witnesses, is GRANTED. This case is transferred to Judge William L. Campbell, Jr. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 11/1/19. (gb) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • (#8) ORDER the ICMC set for Nov. 13, 2019 is cancelled to be reset by Judge Frensley. (JBB) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. After discussion with Magistrate Judge Frensley. The clerk is direct to transfer this case at this level from me to Judge Frensley. This will better coordinate the two cases. A decision to consolidate them for other purposes can then be made. (JBB) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Carmon Waddell. (Sprader, Paul) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(h). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/10/19. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Glenda Hawkins Pipkin, Paul L. Sprader and Danica Renee Grosko. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RECEIPT #34675056212 in the amount of $400.00 posted by Carmon Waddell re #1 Notice of Removal,. (dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carmon Waddell from Circuit Court for Rutherford County, Tennessee, case number 76185. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34675056212) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.