This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:12:10 (UTC).

Lanouette et al v. Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Lanouette filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Hammer and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17046

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael A. Hammer

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANE DOE

Brian Lanouette

Defendants

RETRIEVAL-MASTERS CREDITOR'S BUREAU, INC.

OPTUM360 LLC

QUEST DIAGNOSTICS INCORPORATED

In Re

AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spencer Sheehan

Attorney at Sheehan & Associates, P.C.

505 Northern Boulevard, Suite 311

Great Neck, NY 11021

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/31/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Optum360, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17011294)Document filed by Brian Lanouette, Jane Doe.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#11

(#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum360, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optum360, LLC. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05216. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • Member Case Transferred in on 8/22/19 from the Southern District of New York 7:19-05216 for MDL 2904 AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLECTION AGENCY, INC., CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer added. (gh, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-05216. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (sjo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 7/31/2019) (sjo) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Optum360, LLC. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Optum360, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Doe, Brian Lanouette. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Optum360, LLC, Quest Diagnostics Incorporated, Retrieval-Masters Creditors Bureau, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17011294)Document filed by Brian Lanouette, Jane Doe.(Sheehan, Spencer) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.