This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/25/2022 at 07:51:08 (UTC).

Lankford v. Transworld Systems Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/27/2021 Lankford filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Transworld Systems Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-01358

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Lankford

Defendant

Transworld Systems Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yaakov Saks

Attorney at Stein Saks, PLLC

One University Plaza Suite 620, Hackensack

Hackensack, NJ 07601

Defendant Attorneys

Charles R. Penot, Jr.

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC

900 Jackson St., Suite 440

Dallas, TX 75202

Dayle M. Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Dr., Ste. 195

Tampa, FL 33618

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15561192), filed by Matthew Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Letter

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Matthew Lankford. (Saks, Yaakov) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/27/2021) (lad). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#3

(#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Matthew Lankford. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Transworld Systems Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Lankford. Transworld Systems Inc. served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles R. Penot, Jr on behalf of Transworld Systems Inc.. Attorney Charles R. Penot, Jr added to party Transworld Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#7

(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Transworld Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

7 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Certificate of Interested Parties by Transworld Systems Inc.. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle M. Van Hoose on behalf of Transworld Systems Inc.. Attorney Dayle M. Van Hoose added to party Transworld Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (Van Hoose, Dayle) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Transworld Systems, Inc. shall have until March 1, 2022 to respond to the Class Action Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eglc) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Transworld Systems Inc. answer due 3/1/2022. (jc5) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle M. Van Hoose on behalf of Transworld Systems Inc.. Attorney Dayle M. Van Hoose added to party Transworld Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (Van Hoose, Dayle) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Parties by Transworld Systems Inc.. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Transworld Systems Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles R. Penot, Jr on behalf of Transworld Systems Inc.. Attorney Charles R. Penot, Jr added to party Transworld Systems Inc.(pty:dft) (Penot, Charles) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Matthew Lankford. Transworld Systems Inc. served on 1/18/2022, answer due 2/8/2022. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Transworld Systems Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Matthew Lankford. (Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Matthew Lankford. (Saks, Yaakov) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/27/2021) (lad). (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15561192), filed by Matthew Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Saks, Yaakov) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSWORLD SYSTEM INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles R Penot, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dayle Marie Van Hoose