This case was last updated from PACER on 08/09/2020 at 10:56:10 (UTC).

Lankford v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 Lankford filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03815

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dathan Lankford

Defendants

Philip Morris USA Inc

John Does 1-100, Inclusive

NJOY, LLC

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Group Inc.

Juul Labs Inc.

Nu Mark LLC

NJOY Vapor Products, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Roe Frazer, III

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Burton Hills Blvd., Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

William Matthew Pettit

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Butron Hills Blvd, Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

Patrick McMurtray

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Butron Hills Blvd, Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

Thomas Roe Frazer, II

Attorney at Frazer, PLC

30 Burton Hills Blvd., Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

W. Matthew Pettit

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Butron Hills Boulevard, Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

Defendant Attorneys

Ronald S Range, Jr

Attorney at Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC (Johnson)

100 Med Tech Parkway, Suite 200

Johnson City, TN 37604

Wade V Davies

Attorney at Ritchie, Dillard, Davies & Johnson, P.C.

606 West Main Street, Suite 300

Knoxville, TN 37902

 

Court Documents

34 #1

*Restricted*

#34

(#34) Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00005. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/11/2020)

#33

(#33) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Lankford and Breathe DC actions are transferred to the Northern District of California, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick III for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (BJL) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#32

(#32) STATUS REPORT by Dathan Lankford. (Frazer, Thomas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

#31

(#31) NOTICE OF Activity in Case MDL No. 2936 IN RE: Smitty's CAM2 303 Tractor Hydraulic Fluid Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation-Hearing Order. (BJL) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

#30

(#30) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. In the event the JPML declines to transfer the case, NJOY shall respond to the complaint within 30 days of the JPML's entry of such an order. Plaintiff and NJOY are further ORDERED to file a joint report regarding the status of this matter within 60 days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 3/23/20. (GRE) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#29

(#29) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Range, Ronald) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#28

(#28) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Client Services LLC. (Range, Ronald) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#25

(#30) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. In the event the JPML declines to transfer the case, NJOY shall respond to the complaint within 30 days of the JPML's entry of such an order. Plaintiff and NJOY are further ORDERED to file a joint report regarding the status of this matter within 60 days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 3/23/20. (GRE) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

2 #4

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., NJOY, LLC, Nu Mark, LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Altria Group, Inc., #2 Nu Mark, LLC, #3 NJoy, LLC, #4 Philip Morris USA, Inc.)(SAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Other Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., John Does 1-100 Inclusive, NJOY, LLC, f/k/a NJOY Vapor Products, LLC, Nu Mark, LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4213759.), filed by Dathan Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Frazer, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketMEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2913: Eastern District of Tennessee, 4:20cv00005HSMSKL, Lankford v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 20-cv-03815-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2020) Modified on 6/11/2020 (arkS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00005. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Northern District of California,. Certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (BJL) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER from the UNITED STATES JUDICIAL PANEL on MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION ORDER IN RE: JUUL LABS, INC., MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Lankford and Breathe DC actions are transferred to the Northern District of California, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable William H. Orrick III for inclusion in the coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Karen K. Caldwell Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION (BJL) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STATUS REPORT by Dathan Lankford. (Frazer, Thomas) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF Activity in Case MDL No. 2936 IN RE: Smitty's CAM2 303 Tractor Hydraulic Fluid Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation-Hearing Order. (BJL) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint. In the event the JPML declines to transfer the case, NJOY shall respond to the complaint within 30 days of the JPML's entry of such an order. Plaintiff and NJOY are further ORDERED to file a joint report regarding the status of this matter within 60 days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 3/23/20. (GRE) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Range, Ronald) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Client Services LLC. (Range, Ronald) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Group Distribution Company. (Range, Ronald) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4220161.) filed by Dathan Lankford, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4220166.) filed by Dathan Lankford as to Dathan Lankford. (BDG) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4220166.) by Dathan Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Frazer, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number ATNEDC-4220161.) by Dathan Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Frazer, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac). (SAC)Mailed to Attorneys McMurtray; Frazer, III; Pettit. (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 30, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 30, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Governing Depositions.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on January 30, 2020. (SAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., NJOY, LLC, Nu Mark, LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Altria Group, Inc., #2 Nu Mark, LLC, #3 NJoy, LLC, #4 Philip Morris USA, Inc.)(SAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketDistrict Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (SAC) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., John Does 1-100 Inclusive, NJOY, LLC, f/k/a NJOY Vapor Products, LLC, Nu Mark, LLC, Philip Morris USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNEDC-4213759.), filed by Dathan Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Other Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Frazer, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NJOY, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nu Mark LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Altria Client Services LLC is a litigant