This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 10:30:19 (UTC).

Langston v. Wells et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Langston filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wells. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael G Gotsch, Sr and Damon R Leichty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00198

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

Presiding Judge

Damon R Leichty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deondre Langston

Bunker Hill, IN 46914-9810

Defendants

T Hobbs

Adam Kaunff

Nicole Wells

Hill

Cody Salyer

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Mail Returned from Deondre Langston as Undeliverable - Refused - Return to Sender - Not at MCF - Transferred to WCU re #3 Order. (bas) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned from Deondre Langston as Undeliverable - Transferred to WCU - #1 Pro Se Complaint. (kms) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING the plaintiff, Deondre Langston, IDOC # 109009, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 3/24/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund Dept) (lhc) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Deondre Langston. (kms) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Hill, T Hobbs, Adam Kaunff, Cody Salyer, Nicole Wells, filed by Deondre Langston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Langston)(kms) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Mail Returned from Deondre Langston as Undeliverable - Refused - Return to Sender - Not at MCF - Transferred to WCU re #3 Order. (bas) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Change of Address by Deondre Langston from Miami Correctional Facility to Westville Correctional Control Unit. (Sent copy of DE #1 and #3 to Langston) (kms) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned from Deondre Langston as Undeliverable - Transferred to WCU - #1 Pro Se Complaint. (kms) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the initial partial filing fee; ORDERING the plaintiff, Deondre Langston, IDOC # 109009, to pay (and the facility having custody to automatically remit) to the clerk 20% of the money received for each calendar month during which $10.00 or more is received, until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full; DIRECTING the clerk to create a ledger for receipt of these funds; and DIRECTING the clerk to send a copy of this order to each facility where the plaintiff is housed until the filing fee has been paid in full. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 3/24/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Inmate Trust Fund Dept) (lhc) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Prisoner Trust Account Ledger attached) by Plaintiff Deondre Langston. (kms) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against Hill, T Hobbs, Adam Kaunff, Cody Salyer, Nicole Wells, filed by Deondre Langston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(File stamped copy with case number sent to Langston)(kms) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hill is a litigant