This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/26/2022 at 08:22:28 (UTC).

Langston v. Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.

Case Summary

On 01/25/2022 Langston filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory K Frizzell and Susan E Huntsman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory K Frizzell

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Langston

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Bartlett Patterson

Attorney at Edwards & Patterson (McAlester)

Po Box 1066

Mcalester, OK 74502

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman

1515 E 71St St Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

Mark Thomas Steele

Attorney at Latham Steele Lehman

1515 E 71St St Ste 200

Tulsa, OK 74136

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Walmrt, Inc. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Craig County, case number cj-2021-00060 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2549830) by Walmrt, Inc. (With attachments) (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Craig County Docket

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Thomas Steele on behalf of Walmrt, Inc. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt on behalf of Walmrt, Inc. [Note: Attorney Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt added to party Walmrt, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Walmrt, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#6

(#6) JURY DEMAND by Walmrt, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Walmrt, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#10

(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.) by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 3/10/2022) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

#12

(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 3/10/2022) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East L.P.) by Wal-Mart Stores East L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Walmrt, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for WALMRT, INC., dba WALMART SUPERCENTER STORE #50 be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #7 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Walmrt, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) JURY DEMAND by Walmrt, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Walmrt, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt on behalf of Walmrt, Inc. [Note: Attorney Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt added to party Walmrt, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Pratt, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Thomas Steele on behalf of Walmrt, Inc. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Craig County, case number cj-2021-00060 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2549830) by Walmrt, Inc. (With attachments) (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Walmrt, Inc. (Steele, Mark) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Walmrt, Inc. by Mark Langston (bjb, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Thomas Steele