This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/12/2021 at 07:46:16 (UTC).

Langston v. SPX Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 Langston filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against SPX Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Langston

Defendant

SPX Corporation d/b/a Genfare

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Philip Stephens Holloway

53 West Jackson Boulevard, Suite 1234

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Vincent Furlong

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4500

Chicago, IL 60606

Katherine A. Manuel

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

155 N. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SPX Corporation by Michael Vincent Furlong (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant SPX Corporation by Katherine A. Manuel (Manuel, Katherine) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial telephone conference is set for 4/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial; (3) The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least THREE business days prior to the initial status and ALL further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Joint status report due by 4/9/2021. Participants should use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Emailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Crystal Langston. SPX Corporation waiver sent on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (Holloway, Philip) (Entered: 01/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant SPX Corporation (jg, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Holloway, Philip) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crystal Langston by Philip Stephens Holloway (Holloway, Philip) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crystal Langston; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-17814292.(Holloway, Philip) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPX Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Stephens Holloway