This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:46:46 (UTC).

Langhorst v. St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Langhorst filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against St Louis Convention Visitors Commission. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00382

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diane Langhorst

Defendants and Cross Defendants

John Doe B

St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission d/b/a Explore St. Louis

John Doe A

Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC

St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission

St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission doing business as Explore St. Louis

Cross Claimant and Defendant

St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colleen C. Jones

Attorney at COOK AND YSURSA LTD

12 W. Lincoln St.

Belleville, IL 62220

Gregory L. Shevlin

Attorney at COOK AND SHEVLIN

12 W. Lincoln Street

Belleville, IL 62220-2085

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

William T. Kacerovskis

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEPHEN H. LARSON

940 West Port Plaza, Suite 208

St. Louis, MO 63146-3118

Robert Leo Devereux, Jr.

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Robert Leo Devereux, Jr.

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

David P. Bub

Attorney at BROWN AND JAMES PC - St Louis

800 Market St., Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63101

 

Court Documents

17 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

17 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

17 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM In Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kacerovskis, William) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

16 #2

Exhibit B

16 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Diane Langhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Colleen) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiff Diane Langhorst. (Jones, Colleen) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

14 #2

Exhibit Agreement

14 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition

#14

(#14) CROSSCLAIM against defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLCNo Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued No, Consents issued No, Jury demand,, filed by St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit Agreement)(Devereux, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

13 #2

Exhibit Crossclaim

13 #1

Exhibit Agreement

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to File Crossclaim Against Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC by Defendant St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Crossclaim)(Devereux, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#12

(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Leo Devereux, Jr for Defendant St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Devereux, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

#11

(#11) REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Pursuant to the order of recusal by the Honorable Catherine D. Perry on March 12, 2020, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (KXS) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#10

(#10) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States District Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case, and the Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign the case to another Judge of this Court. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/12/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal)(Kacerovskis, William) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM In Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Kacerovskis, William) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Diane Langhorst. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jones, Colleen) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Twenty-Second Judicial Circuit, St. Louis City, Missouri by Plaintiff Diane Langhorst. (Jones, Colleen) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CROSSCLAIM against defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLCNo Summons(es) issued, Waivers issued No, Consents issued No, Jury demand,, filed by St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Petition, #2 Exhibit Agreement)(Devereux, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Leave to File Crossclaim Against Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC by Defendant St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Crossclaim)(Devereux, Robert) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Leo Devereux, Jr for Defendant St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Devereux, Robert) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REASSIGNMENT ORDER (GJL). Pursuant to the order of recusal by the Honorable Catherine D. Perry on March 12, 2020, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is reassigned to the Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (KXS) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the undersigned United States District Judge is disqualified from handling any matters in this case, and the Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign the case to another Judge of this Court. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/12/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • Docket(#9) Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 3/22/2020. (TMT) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to State Court of Removal)(Kacerovskis, William) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by David P. Bub for Defendant St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission. (Bub, David) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketReceipt 4644086347 in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE on behalf of William T Kacerovskis (CCAM) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Catherine D. Perry. (MFG) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by St. Louis Convention & Visitors Commission.(MFG) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC.(MFG) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Diane Langhorst.(MFG) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 1922-CC00903, with receipt number 4644086347, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Original Filing Form Original filing form, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kacerovskis, William) Modified on 3/11/2020 (MFG). (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Kacerovskis, William) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Nexxt Show Exposition Services, LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Kacerovskis, William) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Devereux

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P. Bub