This case was last updated from PACER on 10/30/2020 at 09:49:06 (UTC).

Langer v. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Langer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Southern California Discount Tire Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sallie Kim and Saundra Brown Armstrong. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-06151

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Sallie Kim

Saundra Brown Armstrong

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Langer

Defendants

Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.

The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation

Discount Tire Co., Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell Clive Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Brian W. LaCorte

1 East Washington Street, Suite 2300

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Scott S. Humphreys

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Susan N. Nikdel

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (A.D.A. CASE):Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/21/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#18

(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation.. (Humphreys, Scott) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #15 Stipulation to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#16

(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/20/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

(#15) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Stipulation to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Scott) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

13 #2

Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona Supreme Court

#13

(#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Brian W. LaCorte) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15024988.) filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona District Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona Supreme Court)(LaCorte, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chris Langer.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Price, Dennis) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chris Langer re #1 Complaint (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Nikdel, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (A.D.A. CASE):Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2021 02:30 PM in Telephone Conference Only. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/21/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2020) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2020) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • Docket(#19) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation.. (Humphreys, Scott) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #15 Stipulation to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2020) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 10/20/2020. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #10 Stipulation to Withdraw Request for Default and Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Complaint filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Scott) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian W. LaCorte. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Brian W. LaCorte) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-15024988.) filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona District Court, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - Arizona Supreme Court)(LaCorte, Brian) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Entry of Default (As to Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., a California Corporation only) filed by Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amanda Seabock, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 10/5/2020) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint filed by Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Nikdel, Susan) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Chris Langer.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Price, Dennis) (Filed on 9/4/2020) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Discount Tire Co., Inc., Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc., The Reinalt-Thomas Corporation. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/15/2020. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Chris Langer re #1 Complaint (Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14884232.). Filed byChris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Handy, Russell) (Filed on 9/1/2020) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less