This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 07:33:00 (UTC).

Chris Langer v. Sunset Subsidiary LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Chris Langer filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Sunset Subsidiary LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles F. Eick and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03935

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Langer

Defendants

Sunset Subsidiary LLC

Does 1-10

Montage Hotels and Resorts, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Zachary Manning Best

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Russell C Handy

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J Schulz

Thomas Uriguen Schroeder

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Chris Langer, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only,, #7 served on 5/14/2021. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 05/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Santa Monica Courthouse. Case number: 21SMCV00627. (jp) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer REMANDING Case to State Court. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) See Order for specifics. (jp) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Montage Hotels and Resorts, LLC, Sunset Subsidiary LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Schulz, Peter) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (rfi) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court&s website under Judge Fischer&s Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge&s Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Montage Hotels and Resorts, LLC served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CT Corporation; Jessie Gastelum (intake specialist) authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/14/2021 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Sunset Subsidiary LLC served on 4/9/2021, answer due 4/30/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company which will do business in California as CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service; Susie Vang Customer Representative in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 4/14/2021 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Montage Hotels and Resorts, LLC, Sunset Subsidiary LLC, filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2021 Submitted with Exhibit A to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Sunset Subsidiary LLC.. (Schulz, Peter) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movants Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Sunset Subsidiary LLC (Schulz, Peter) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movants Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Sunset Subsidiary LLC. (Schulz, Peter) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21SMCV00627 Receipt No: ACACDC-31267223 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC, Sunset Subsidiary LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Attorney Peter J Schulz added to party Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC(pty:bkmov), Attorney Peter J Schulz added to party Sunset Subsidiary LLC(pty:bkmov))(Schulz, Peter) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less