This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:13:29 (UTC).

Langbein v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Langbein filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas P. Woodlock. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10054

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas P. Woodlock

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bjoern J Langbein

Defendants

United States of America

United States Department of Homeland Security (DHS)

Alejandro Myorkas

United States and Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)

Tracy Renaud

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Duo Liu

Attorney at Blumsack & Canzano

867 Boylston St, 5Th Fl

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant Attorney

Erin E. Brizius

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

1 Courthouse Way Suite 9200

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Alejandro Myorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States and Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States of America (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal FILED JOINTLY by Alejandro Myorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States and Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States of America. (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION of Dismissal FILED JOINTLY by Alejandro Myorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States and Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States of America. (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Erin E. Brizius on behalf of Alejandro Myorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States and Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States of America (Brizius, Erin) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (McManus, Caetlin) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Alejandro Myorkas, Tracy Renaud, United States Department of Homeland Security (DHS), United States and Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), United States of America. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (de Oliveira, Flaviana) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9139048 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Bjoern J Langbein. (Attachments: #1 Category Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liu, Duo) (Main Document 1 replaced detached from exhibits, Attachment 2 replaced with corrected version, Additional attachment(s) added #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C) (de Oliveira, Flaviana). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Erin Brizius