This case was last updated from PACER on 03/30/2019 at 07:35:04 (UTC).

LANG et al v. CITY OF PORTLAND

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 LANG filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CITY OF PORTLAND. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and D. BROCK HORNBY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

D. BROCK HORNBY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERT LANG

STEPHEN CONGDON

Defendant

CITY OF PORTLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

AMY P. DIETERICH

Attorney at SKELTON, TAINTOR & ABBOTT

95 Main Street

Auburn, ME 04210

JORDAN PAYNE HAY

Attorney at SKELTON, TAINTOR & ABBOTT

95 Main Street

Auburn, ME 04210

Defendant Attorneys

DANIELLE WEST-CHUHTA

Attorney at CITY OF PORTLAND

389 Congress St

Portland, ME 04101-3059

ANNE TORREGROSSA

Attorney at CITY OF PORTLAND

389 Congress St

Portland, ME 04101-3059

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jib) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order

#10

(#10) Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG Responses due by 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)(DIETERICH, AMY) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG Responses due by 3/26/2019. (DIETERICH, AMY) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/19/2019. Motions due by 8/2/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (CCS) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CITY OF PORTLAND.(TORREGROSSA, ANNE) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT LANG. CITY OF PORTLAND served on 1/31/2019. (DIETERICH, AMY) Modified on 2/8/2019 to change date served from 1/30/19 to 1/31/19 pursuant to the proof of service (jib). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN PAYNE HAY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAY, JORDAN) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to CITY OF PORTLAND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROBERT LANG, STEPHEN CONGDON. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2019) Fee due by 1/31/2019.(bfa) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Confidentiality Order By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (jib) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting without objection #9 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The court's scheduling order, ECF No. 8, is amended to permit up to 9 depositions per side, to permit a Request for Discovery Hearing to be filed upon service of the defendant's anticipated objection to any request for personnel records, and to provide that any motion to bifurcate the plaintiffs' claims for trial be filed by July 19, 2019, the existing L.R. 56(h) notice deadline. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Joint MOTION for Confidentiality Order by STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG Responses due by 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order)(DIETERICH, AMY) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG Responses due by 3/26/2019. (DIETERICH, AMY) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/19/2019. Motions due by 8/2/2019. Ready for Trial on 10/7/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (CCS) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CITY OF PORTLAND.(TORREGROSSA, ANNE) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • (#6) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding Set Answer Deadline: Docket entry modified to reflect the answer deadline of 3/4/19 was calculated and set in error. The correct answer deadline for the City of Portland is 2/21/2019. (jib) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Reset Answer Deadline for CITY OF PORTLAND: Answer due by 2/21/2019 pursuant to the summons returned executed with a proof of service date of 1/31/19. (jib) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • *Filed in Error* SET Answer Deadline for CITY OF PORTLAND pursuant to ECF No. 5: Answer due by 3/4/2019. (nrg) Modified on 2/8/2019 to indicate this deadline was filed/set in error (jib). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by ROBERT LANG. CITY OF PORTLAND served on 1/31/2019. (DIETERICH, AMY) Modified on 2/8/2019 to change date served from 1/30/19 to 1/31/19 pursuant to the proof of service (jib). (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by JORDAN PAYNE HAY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (HAY, JORDAN) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Filing Fee Received from STEPHEN CONGDON, ROBERT LANG: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 0100-1967196. Method of Payment: credit card. Purpose of Payment: civil filing fee. Date Paid: 01/30/2019 re #1 Complaint. (bfa) (Entered: 01/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to CITY OF PORTLAND. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (bfa) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF PORTLAND with Jury Demand PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by ROBERT LANG, STEPHEN CONGDON. (Service of Process Deadline 4/29/2019) Fee due by 1/31/2019.(bfa) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIELLE WEST-CHUHTA