This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 08:48:45 (UTC).

Lane v. State of Florida

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Lane filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against State of Florida. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Badalamenti and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00506

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Badalamenti

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Seth Cordell Lane

Fort Myers, FL 33905

Defendant

State of Florida

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RMT) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice under M.D. Fla. R. 1.03(e). Because the dismissal is without prejudice, Plaintiff may pursue a new case by filing a new complaint--not using this case number--and include the filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending motions or deadlines, and close this case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/21/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#3

(#3) TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/20/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER FOR INCARCERATED PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/20/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

1 #1

Mailing Envelope

#1

(#1) NOTICE of civil action for violation of 6th Amendment Right to Speedy Trial by Seth Cordell Lane (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no fee/ifp)(SLU) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (RMT) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER dismissing case without prejudice under M.D. Fla. R. 1.03(e). Because the dismissal is without prejudice, Plaintiff may pursue a new case by filing a new complaint--not using this case number--and include the filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate any pending motions or deadlines, and close this case. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/21/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRACK ONE AND RELATED CASE ORDER. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/20/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER FOR INCARCERATED PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/20/2020. (SLU) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of civil action for violation of 6th Amendment Right to Speedy Trial by Seth Cordell Lane (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (no fee/ifp)(SLU) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less