This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:53:05 (UTC).

Lane v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Lane filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JUUL LABS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00412

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alyssa Lane

Defendants

JUUL LABS, INC.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Altria Enterprises LLC

James Monsees

James Bowen

Nicholas Pritzker

Hoyoung Huh

Riaz Valani

Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc.

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie LaMacchia

Attorney at Pulaski Kherkher, PLLC

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1725

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (LaMacchia, Leslie) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., James Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., James Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2022) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2913 Lane v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al, Opened in California Northern District as :22-cv-00412-WHO cc: JPMDL (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (LaMacchia, Leslie) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint against Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., James Bowen, Core-Mark Holding Company, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, JUUL LABS, INC., McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Lab, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16827474.). Filed byAlyssa Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaMacchia, Leslie) (Filed on 1/21/2022) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Altria Enterprises LLC is a litigant