This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2021 at 08:10:39 (UTC).

Lane v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Lane filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Freda L. Wolfson and Lois H. Goodman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-16575

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen M Lane

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM G. COLVIN

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

801 Broad Street, Suite 428

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Tara L. Blake

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP (Nash)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37201

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#12

#11

10 #1

*Restricted*

10 #10

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#9

#8

7 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

7 #7

Main Document

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketChief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 1:21-cv-00178. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of New Jersey. (GRE) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2021 03:00 PM in Judge's Chambers (Telephonic Hearing) before District Judge Charles E Atchley Jr.Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 9/1/21. (KFB) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (KMK) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information - Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (KMK) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss - Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (KMK) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Governing Depositions - Signed by District Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr on 8/31/2021. (KMK) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge Charles E Atchley, Jr and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added per random assignment. Case is not deemed as related by Judge Lee. (KMK) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of RELATED ACTIONS by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc. (KFB) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase has been referred to Magistrate Judge Lee for related case determination. (LCK) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc..(Blake, Tara) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF DEFENDANTS JOHNSON & JOHNSON AND JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC. from Hamilton County Circuit Court, case number 21C652. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNEDC-4814199), filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Blake, Tara) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William G Colvin