This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2022 at 09:02:30 (UTC).

Lane et al v. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2022 Lane filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01175

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steve Antonio Lane

Charrise J Lane

Defendants

Secretary, Department of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Stoller

Attorney at Law Offices of David Stoller, PA

4445 S Conway Rd

Orlando, FL 32812-0073

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/8/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS returned executed on 7/12/2022 as to the US Attorney's Office by Steve Antonio Lane, Charrise J Lane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit proof of service)(Stoller, David) Text modified on 8/9/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Steve Antonio Lane, Charrise J Lane. Secretary, Department of Homeland Security served on 7/14/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Steve Antonio Lane, Charrise J Lane. Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 7/14/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Summons Executed)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Order by Charrise J Lane, Steve Antonio Lane. (Stoller, David) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Charrise J Lane, Steve Antonio Lane. Related case(s): Yes (Stoller, David) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued as to All Defendants. (RDO) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/8/2022. (GNB) (Entered: 07/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-01175-PGB-EJK. (APV) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19750697) filed by Steve Antonio Lane, Charrise J Lane. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Signed Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Exhibit I-130 Receipt, #5 Exhibit Web Portal information, #6 Exhibit I-485 receipt, #7 Exhibit Web Portal info Re I-485, #8 Exhibit Processing times, #9 Exhibit How to Read Processing times, #10 Exhibit Historical Processing Times)(Stoller, David) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary, Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Stoller