This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2022 at 19:44:40 (UTC).

Lane Coder Photography LLC v. William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Lane Coder Photography LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against William Pitt - Julia B Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey A. Meyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00861

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey A. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lane Coder Photography LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Insider, Inc.

Tribune Content Agency, LLC

Seattle Times Company

William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc.

NBCUniversal Media, LLC

Los Angeles Times Communications, LLC

Tribune Publishing Company, LLC

John Does

Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Leichtman

Attorney at Leichtman Law PLLC

228 East 45Th Streetsuite 605

New York, NY 10017

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Pergament

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Oren J Warshavsky

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

45 Rockefeller Plaza

New York, NY 10111

Jura C. Zibas

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker

150 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Matthew David Valauri

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker , LLP - Stmfd CT

1010 Washington Boulevard

Stamford, CT 06901

Elizabeth M Lacombe

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

100 Pearl Street13Th Floor

Hartford, CT 06103

Daniel J Schwartz

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

70 W. Madisonste 5200

Chicago, IL 60602-4378

Erin Huntington

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

677 Broadwayste 10Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

Santo Borruso

Attorney at Nixon Peabody-Jericho NY

50 Jericho Quadrangle, Suite 300

Jericho, NY 11753-2728

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Daniel J Schwartz

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

70 W. Madisonste 5200

Chicago, IL 60602-4378

Erin Huntington

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

677 Broadwayste 10Th Floor

Albany, NY 12207

Santo Borruso

Attorney at Nixon Peabody-Jericho NY

50 Jericho Quadrangle, Suite 300

Jericho, NY 11753-2728

 

Court Documents

65 #2

Proposed Order

65 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Lerner

65 #65

Main Document

#64

(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Jura C. Zibas on behalf of William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc. (Zibas, Jura) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

#62

(#62) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jura C. Zibas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6716597) by William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc.. (Valauri, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

61 #1

Affidavit of Jura C. Zibas

61 #61

Main Document

#60

(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Schwartz on behalf of Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

#3

#2

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketJUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#68) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. After a settlement conference on November 24, 2021, Judge Farrish reported that this action has been settled in full (Doc. # 67 ). Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before December 27, 2021. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal (for approval by the court or simply for inclusion in the court's file), they may do so on or before December 27, 2021. The dates set forth in this order may be extended for good cause pursuant to a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/06/21.(Barry, Donna) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#67) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Farrish: Settlement Conference held on 11/23/2021 and 11/24/2021. Total Time: 4 hours and 45 minutes. The parties reached a settlement. Counsel will work together to finalize the settlement documentation, but have been informed that Judge Meyer may elect to close the case administratively on the docket in the meantime. (Farrish, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark Lerner Certificate of Good Standing due by 1/18/2022. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2021. (Walker, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark Lerner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6726677) by NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Lerner, #2 Proposed Order)(Lacombe, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) NOTICE of Appearance by Jura C. Zibas on behalf of William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc. (Zibas, Jura) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ORDER granting #61 Motion for Attorney Jura C. Zibas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 11/10/2021. (Carr, Dave) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jura C. Zibas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6716597) by William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc.. (Valauri, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) MOTION for Attorney(s) Jura C. Zibas to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6716597) by William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jura C. Zibas)(Valauri, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J Schwartz on behalf of Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 10/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint,, filed by Lane Coder Photography LLC, #4 Report on Copyright Form, #5 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Lane Coder Photography LLC, #7 Protective Order, #6 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Lane Coder Photography LLC Signed by Clerk on 6/24/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/23/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/23/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/22/2021; Discovery due by 12/23/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 1/27/2022. Signed by Clerk on 6/23/2021.(Freberg, B) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketJudge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Insider, Inc., Los Angeles Times Communications, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Seattle Times Company, Tribune Content Agency, LLC, Tribune Publishing Company, LLC, William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc.. (Leichtman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Copyright Form Completed. (Leichtman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lane Coder Photography LLC. (Leichtman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Lane Coder Photography LLC re: Civil Cover Sheet (Leichtman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, John Does 1-100, Insider, Inc., Los Angeles Times Communications, LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Seattle Times Company, Tribune Content Agency, LLC, Tribune Publishing Company, LLC, William Pitt - Julia B. Fee Sotheby's International Realty, Inc. ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6554873.), filed by Lane Coder Photography LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Leichtman, David) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Seattle Times is a litigant

Latest cases where Los Angele Times Communications LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where INSIDER INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant