This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 09:45:15 (UTC).

LANDSTAR RANGER INC v. CENTURION CONTAINER LLC,et al.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 LANDSTAR RANGER INC filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against CENTURION CONTAINER LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is HUGH LAWSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HUGH LAWSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDSTAR RANGER INC

Defendants

CENTURION CONTAINER LLC

COLONIAL GROUP INC

COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC

CENTURION CONTAINER OF THE CAROLINAS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOSHUA C CANTON

325 John Knox Rd Ste 105

Tallahassee, FL 32303

JUSTIN B HALES

126 N Broad St

Thomasville, GA 31792

 

Court Documents

#13

#12

11 #1

Exhibit to M-Amd Amended Complaint

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit to Amd Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

#9

#8

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Affidavit

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against CENTURION CONTAINER LLC, COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (HALES, JUSTIN) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint by not later than September 2, 2021. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 8/26/2021. (aks) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Amend/Correct #9 Amended Complaint/Petition by LANDSTAR RANGER INC filed by JUSTIN B HALES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to M-Amd Amended Complaint)(HALES, JUSTIN) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC. as to COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC (HALES, JUSTIN) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Docket text must include a description of the exhibit whereas it is of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court. No need to refile. Entry has been corrected by case administrator. (sbd) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Brian G. Pfeifer)(HALES, JUSTIN) Modified on 8/19/2021 (sbd). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #7 Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); After the filing of the initial complaint, any proposed summons should be emailed to the Court for issuance. No need to email this time as summons has been issued.(sbd) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to COLONIAL CHEMICAL SOLUTIONS INC. (sbd) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Amended Complaint/Petition filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Document must be re-filed to include a description of exhibit(s). A generic identifier such as Exhibit 1 or Exhibit A is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the Court. (sbd) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons (proposed) by LANDSTAR RANGER INC as to Colonial Chemical Solutions. (HALES, JUSTIN) Modified text on 8/19/2021 (sbd). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **REFILED AT #9** AMENDED #1 Complaint, against All Defendants by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(HALES, JUSTIN) Modified text on 8/19/2021 (sbd). (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to COLONIAL GROUP INC. (sbd) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to CENTURION CONTAINER LLC. (sbd) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Jurisdictional Statement by LANDSTAR RANGER INC (HALES, JUSTIN) Modified on 7/8/2021 (esl). (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint, filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed.(rlw) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Notice to Counsel - JOSHUA C CANTON. Your address in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your address via PACER.(rlw) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Complaint filed by LANDSTAR RANGER INC ); Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. Also, a civil cover sheet should have been an attachment to your complaint. Please email a completed cover sheet to valdosta.ecf@gamd.uscourts.gov to be attached to your complaint.(rlw) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketUS DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON added. US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER no longer assigned to case. (rlw) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) This is a text only entry; no document issued.CASE TRANSFERRED TO THE VALDOSTA DIVISION Pursuant to Local Rule 3.4 Statement.(mdm) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Landstart Ranger, Inc. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3836146, $402 filed by Landstart Ranger, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(HALES, JUSTIN) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (rlw). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLONIAL GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LANDSTAR RANGER INC. is a litigant