This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 16:53:27 (UTC).

Landry v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 Landry filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-16345

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kathleen Landry

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

K&B Louisiana Corporation

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC

LUZENAC AMERICA, INC.

K&B Louisiana Corporation Individually and as Successor in Interest to Katz & Bestoff, Inc. doing business as Riteaid Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Damon R. Pourciau

Attorney at Ardoin Law Firm

2200 Veterans Memorial Blvd., Suite 210

Kenner, LA 70062

Christopher Joseph Fransen

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Scott Michael Galante

Attorney at Galante & Bivalacqua LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2615

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jeanne Louise St. Romain

Attorney at The Cheek Law Firm

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Rubiante Lolana Brown

Attorney at Cheek Law Firm, LLC

650 Poydras, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

LINDSEY A. CHEEK

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2310

New Orleans, LA 70130

Defendant Attorneys

John W. Sinnott

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC NJ BAR

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

James B. Irwin, V

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Claire Adams Noonan

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie et al

400 Poydras St Ste 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Carlos Andre Benach

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie et al

400 Poydras St Ste 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Leila Anne D'Aquin

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie et al

400 Poydras St Ste 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kim E. Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Meera Unnithan Sossamon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore LLC

400 Poydras Street, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jonathan David Lewis

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Lambert Joseph Hassinger, Jr.

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Jeffrey J. Siemann

Attorney at Galloway, Johnson, Tompkins, Burr & Smith (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St. Suite 4040, 40Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70139

Mindy Brickman

Attorney at Christovich & Kearney, LLP

601 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130-6078

Oscar M. Gwin, IV

Attorney at Christovich & Kearney, LLP

601 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130-6078

Christy L. McMannen

Attorney at Christovich & Kearney, LLP

601 Poydras St., Suite 2300

New Orleans, LA 70130-6078

 

Court Documents

26 #1

*Restricted*

#26

25 #1

Transmittal Letter

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Exhibit A

#21

#5

#3

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit B Part 4

1 #4

Exhibit B Part 3

1 #3

Exhibit B Part 2

1 #2

Exhibit B Part 1

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

#1

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09554. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Order of MDL Transfer to District of New Jersey. MDL case number is 2738. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(sa) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2738. (sa) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Withdrawal of Opposition to Motion for Remand. (Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that the following Section J cases are hereby reallotted to Judge Greg Guidry, Section T of this Court, effective as of the date of this Order. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2019.(cg) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE by Kathleen Landry of supplemental authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Carl Barbier. Judge Wendy B Vitter no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/11/2019.(jeg) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/3/2019.(cg) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDERED that oral argument re #14 MOTION to Remand is CANCELLED. The motion shall be considered on the briefs unless the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in Opposition filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(cg) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kathleen Landry. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading - Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D1, #7 Exhibit D2, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Request for Oral Argument, #12 Notice of Submission)(Cheek, Lindsey) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/21/2019) (gec). (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/21/2019) (gec). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #13 Proposed Order on Motion for Leave to File) (gec). Modified on 5/21/2019 (gec). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Noonan, Claire) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. re #3 Order. (Sossamon, Meera) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. of Recent Court Decision from the Southern District of New York. (Attachments: #1 Recent Decision from SDNY Court)(Noonan, Claire) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., are granted an additional twenty-one (21) days from the date on which responsive pleadings would otherwise be due to file said pleadings. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 4/25/2019. (cg) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benach, Carlos) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Exhibit 1 was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image.** (sbs) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. By the Clerk.(sbs) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2017-10827 G-11 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 053L-7587751) filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B Part 1, #3 Exhibit B Part 2, #4 Exhibit B Part 3, #5 Exhibit B Part 4, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Meera Unnithan Sossamon added to party Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(pty:dft).(Sossamon, Meera) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/22/2019) (sbs). Modified text on 4/22/2019 (sbs). (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where K&B Louisiana Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Joseph Fransen