This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/06/2020 at 09:02:15 (UTC).

Landry v. Ideal Implant Inc

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Landry filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ideal Implant Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01007

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donna Landry

Defendants

Ideal Implant, Inc.

Ideal Implant Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin R Duck

Attorney at Duck Law Firm

5040 Ambassador Caffery Pkwy Ste 200

Lafayette, LA 70508

Defendant Attorneys

Rachel Guajardo Webre

Attorney at Gieger Laborde & Laperouse

701 Poydras St Ste 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139

Michael D Cangelosi

Attorney at Gieger Laborde & Laperouse

701 Poydras St Ste 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Exhibit B

#2

#3

#4

#5

#7

7 #1

Exhibit A

#8

8 #1

Attachments to scheduling order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachment: #1 Attachment to scheduling conference order)(crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Ideal Implant Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REMOVAL ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Cangelosi, Michael) Modified docket text on 9/11/2020 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE REGARDING HURRICANE LAURA: The Lake Charles area sustained extensive damage due to Hurricane Laura, including the Edwin F. Hunter, Jr. Courthouse. All proceedings and deadlines due within the next 30 days before Judge Cain are suspended. All proceedings and deadlines due before Magistrate Judge Kay remain as previously set. The court will advise of resettings in due course on a per-case basis via CM/ECF. Parties are encouraged to electronically file for relief or extensions, but if unable to do so, to call chambers and leave a message. Your message will be responded to promptly. (crt,Dunford, T) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ideal Implant Inc.(aty,Cangelosi, Michael) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/13/2020. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2020. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ideal Implant Inc. (aty,Webre, Rachel) Modified docket text on 8/10/2020 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2020-2069 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4350427) filed by Ideal Implant Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Attorney Rachel Guajardo Webre added to party Ideal Implant, Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Webre, Rachel) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/7/2020) (Bunting, M). Modified docket text on 8/10/2020 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael D. Cangelosi