This case was last updated from PACER on 01/03/2020 at 07:17:29 (UTC).

LANDMEIER v. TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 LANDMEIER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS and MARK E WALKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00547

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Landmeier

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendants

Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc.

TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARIE A MATTOX

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

ADAM JAMES ELLIS

Attorney at MARIE A MATTOX PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

203 North Gadsden Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorneys

STEPHEN AUSTIN CATTANI

Attorney at PENNINGTON PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

215 S Monroe St, Suite 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

BRANDICE DAVIDSON DICKSON

Attorney at PENNINGTON MOORE WILKINSON ETC - TALLAHASSEE FL

215 S Monroe St, Ste 200

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff has filed a Motion to Remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). ECF No. #9 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. This Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law cause of action in Count I of Plaintiff's amended complaint. The Clerk shall remand this action to the Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit, in and for Leon County, Florida. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/5/19. (blb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Remand by DENNIS LANDMEIER. (ELLIS, ADAM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#7

(#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC, filed by DENNIS LANDMEIER. (ELLIS, ADAM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JAMES ELLIS on behalf of DENNIS LANDMEIER (ELLIS, ADAM) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

(#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/19/2019. Discovery due by 3/4/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/25/2020. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/5/19. (blb) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 001974. (Filing fee $400.), filed by Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc.. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND. Plaintiff has filed a Motion to Remand pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). ECF No. #9 . Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. This Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law cause of action in Count I of Plaintiff's amended complaint. The Clerk shall remand this action to the Circuit Court of the Second Judicial Circuit, in and for Leon County, Florida. The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/5/19. (blb) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Remand by DENNIS LANDMEIER. (ELLIS, ADAM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against TALLAHASSEE MEMORIAL HEALTHCARE INC, filed by DENNIS LANDMEIER. (ELLIS, ADAM) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM JAMES ELLIS on behalf of DENNIS LANDMEIER (ELLIS, ADAM) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • (#5) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400037909. Fee status updated to paid. (blb) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/19/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/19/2019. Discovery due by 3/4/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 2/25/2020. Status Report due by 12/5/2019. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/5/19. (blb) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Attorney STEPHEN AUSTIN CATTANI Re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL- Counsel is advised by this entry for future case openings: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or Chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide", (both available on the clerk's website). (blb) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc. from Second Judicial Circuit Court, Leon County, Florida, case number 2019 CA 001974. (Filing fee $400.), filed by Tallahassee Memorial HealthCare, Inc.. (CATTANI, STEPHEN) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less