This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2019 at 07:11:40 (UTC).

Landmark View, Inc., et al v. Jing Ning et al

Case Summary

On 07/24/2019 Landmark View, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Jing Ning. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-06401

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Landmark View, Inc., a California corporation

Landmark View, Inc.

Petitioner

DOES 1 through 25

Defendants

Jing Ning

Jinghe Liu

DOES 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David P Beitchman

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436

Paul Tokar

Attorney at Beitchman and Zekian PC

16130 Ventura Boulevard Suite 570

Encino, CA 91436-2581

Defendant Attorneys

James Walter Hill

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman a Machtinger LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 21St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Priya Sopori

Attorney at Greenberg Glusker Fields Claman and Machtinger LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 2100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees as incurred against one another in connection with this action. The Clerk is hereby directed to close the file for this case. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

10 #1

Proposed Order Dismissing Entire Action With Prejudice

#10

(#10) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Jinghe Liu, Jing Ning. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Entire Action With Prejudice)(Hill, James) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jinghe Liu answer now due 8/14/2019; Jing Ning answer now due 8/14/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Jinghe Liu; Jing Ning.(Attorney James Walter Hill added to party Jinghe Liu(pty:dft))(Hill, James) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06401 CJC(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

5 #2

Proof of Service

5 #1

Exhibit 1 - Defendant Jing Ning's Notice to the Superior Court and to Plai

#5

(#5) NOTICE filed by Defendant Jing Ning. NOTICE OF FILING AND SERVICE OF NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT AND ALL ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Jing Ning's Notice to the Superior Court and to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court, and exhibits, #2 Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#4

(#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jing Ning, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jing Ning, (Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jing Ning. (Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - Superior Court Filings

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - Second Amendment to Amended & Restated Operating Agreement

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - First Amendment to Amended & Restated Operating Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Original Operating Agreement

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, Central District, case number 19STCV18532 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 07/24/2019, receipt number 26J1H148), filed by Defendant Jing Ning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended and Restated Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Original Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - First Amendment to Amended & Restated Operating Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Second Amendment to Amended & Restated Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Superior Court Filings) (Attorney James Walter Hill added to party Jing Ning(pty:dft))(Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER DISMISSING ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #10 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees as incurred against one another in connection with this action. The Clerk is hereby directed to close the file for this case. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Jinghe Liu, Jing Ning. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Entire Action With Prejudice)(Hill, James) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jinghe Liu answer now due 8/14/2019; Jing Ning answer now due 8/14/2019, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendants Jinghe Liu; Jing Ning.(Attorney James Walter Hill added to party Jinghe Liu(pty:dft))(Hill, James) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-06401 CJC(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (jtil) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Landmark View, Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/29/2019, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil) Modified on 7/25/2019 (jtil). (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE filed by Defendant Jing Ning. NOTICE OF FILING AND SERVICE OF NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT AND ALL ADVERSE PARTIES OF REMOVAL OF ACTION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Defendant Jing Ning's Notice to the Superior Court and to Plaintiff of Removal of Action to Federal Court, and exhibits, #2 Proof of Service)(Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jing Ning, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 (Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Jing Ning, (Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Jing Ning. (Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, Central District, case number 19STCV18532 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 07/24/2019, receipt number 26J1H148), filed by Defendant Jing Ning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended and Restated Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Original Operating Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 - First Amendment to Amended & Restated Operating Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Second Amendment to Amended & Restated Operating Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 - Superior Court Filings) (Attorney James Walter Hill added to party Jing Ning(pty:dft))(Hill, James) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDMARK VIEW INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David P Beitchman