This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2021 at 09:44:11 (UTC).

LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. v. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are David S. Cercone and W. Scott Hardy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00346

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David S. Cercone

W. Scott Hardy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC.

Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES

DR. ROCHELLE WALENSKY

MERRICK B. GARLAND

NORRIS COCHRAN

CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION

SHERRI A. BERGER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John P. Corcoran, Jr.

Attorney at Jones, Gregg, Creehan & Gerace

411 Seventh Avenue, Suite 1200

Pittsburgh, PA 15219-1905

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. SHERRI A. BERGER served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021; CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021; NORRIS COCHRAN served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021; MERRICK B. GARLAND served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021; ROCHELLE WALENSKY served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (lar) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) ORDER regarding motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b). See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 4/15/21. (kw) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE United States Attorney's Office (Party in Interest) by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Centers for Disease Control and Prevention by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Dr. Rochelle Walensky, M.D., Ph.D., Director by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Sherri A. Berger, MSPH, Acting Chief of Staff by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Norris Cochran, Secretary by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Merrick B. Garland, Atty. General by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

2 #3

Summons Dr. Walensky

2 #2

Summons Sherri Berger

2 #1

Summons Norris Cochran

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to SHERRI A. BERGER, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, NORRIS COCHRAN, MERRICK B. GARLAND, ROCHELLE WALENSKY (Attachments: #1 Summons Norris Cochran, #2 Summons Sherri Berger, #3 Summons Dr. Walensky, #4 Summons CDC) (lar) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against SHERRI A. BERGER, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, NORRIS COCHRAN, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MERRICK B. GARLAND, ROCHELLE WALENSKY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6410083), filed by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketUpdate Answer Deadline: Answer due from SHERRI A. BERGER on 6/1/2021; CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION on 6/1/2021; NORRIS COCHRAN on 6/7/2021; MERRICK B. GARLAND on 6/7/2021; ROCHELLE WALENSKY on 6/1/2021 (lar) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Certificate of Service. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Summons/Return of Service Returned Executed at #12 . This message is for informational purposes only. (lar) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. SHERRI A. BERGER served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021; CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021; NORRIS COCHRAN served on 4/8/2021, answer due 4/29/2021; MERRICK B. GARLAND served on 4/7/2021, answer due 4/28/2021; ROCHELLE WALENSKY served on 4/2/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (lar) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #9 Certificate of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Service, #7 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Service, #8 Certificate of Service (Corcoran, John) Modified on 4/26/2021 to remove from public view. Redocketed correctly at #12 (lar). (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER regarding motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b). See Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 4/15/21. (kw) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE United States Attorney's Office (Party in Interest) by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Centers for Disease Control and Prevention by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Dr. Rochelle Walensky, M.D., Ph.D., Director by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Sherri A. Berger, MSPH, Acting Chief of Staff by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Norris Cochran, Secretary by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Merrick B. Garland, Atty. General by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. re #2 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Corcoran, John) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketJudge W. Scott Hardy added. (mao) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 3/16/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to SHERRI A. BERGER, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, NORRIS COCHRAN, MERRICK B. GARLAND, ROCHELLE WALENSKY (Attachments: #1 Summons Norris Cochran, #2 Summons Sherri Berger, #3 Summons Dr. Walensky, #4 Summons CDC) (lar) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SHERRI A. BERGER, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION, NORRIS COCHRAN, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, MERRICK B. GARLAND, ROCHELLE WALENSKY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6410083), filed by LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LANDLORD SERVICE BUREAU, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Health and Human Services, Division Children Family Services, also known as D.H.H.S. is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JOHN P CORCORAN, JR.