This case was last updated from PACER on 05/02/2021 at 07:41:10 (UTC).

LANDIS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 LANDIS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00504

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colleen Kollar-Kotelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARLTON THEODORE LANDIS

Thomson, IL 61285

CARLTON THEODORE -LANDIS

Adelanto, CA 92301

Petitioner

SERVICE LIST

Defendants

BUREAU OF ALCOHOL TOBACCO AND FIREMARMS AND EXPLOSIVES

EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS

OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT

FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS

 

Court Documents

#33

(#33) NOTICE of Change of Address by CARLTON THEODORE LANDIS (ztd) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#32

(#32) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/19/2021. (DM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

#31

(#31) SUMMONS (6) Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL TOBACCO AND FIREMARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to US Marshall Service. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

30 #1

*Restricted*

#30

(#30) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-50290. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#29

(#29) TRANSFERRED to the District of Columbia the electronic record. (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#28

(#28) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/17/2021:Electronic/mailed notice(sb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#27

(#27) ORDER: Plaintiff has responded to the court's December 17, 2020, show cause order #25 , as required, with a motion to transfer venue #26 . The court finds that under FOIA, 5 U.S.C. 552, et seq., this court lacks jurisdiction to hear this case and that a transfer of venue is discretionary and is appropriate in the interests of justice. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion #26 is granted and this case is transferred to the District of Columbia for all further matters. The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the District Court for the District of Columbia. This matter is closed on the court's docket and the clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 2/17/2021:notice mailed by judicial staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#25

(#25) ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/17/2020: Plaintiff's revised application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #21 is granted and the initial partial filing fee is waived. While the initial, partial filing fee is waived, plaintiff remains responsible for payment of the full $350.00 filing fee in this case. Plaintiff's motion to compel #15 is denied because the court has the information necessary to determine plaintiff's financial status. The court directs the Clerk of Court to electronically send a copy of this order to the inmate trust account office at AUSP Thomson and to the court's Fiscal Department. Summons, however, shall not issue. It appears under 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(B) that this court lacks jurisdiction over plaintiff's claims. Thus, plaintiff is ordered to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to respond to the order to show cause by January 22, 2021, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for lack of jurisdiction. Mailed/Emailed notice(sb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The court is in receipt of plaintiff's motion to extend time to comply with the court's January 17, 2020 order #7 . The motion is granted. Plaintiff has until March 19, 2020, to submit a renewed in forma pauperis application or pay the statutory filing fee of $400. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 2/18/2020:notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#7

(#8) ORDER: The court is in receipt of plaintiff's motion to extend time to comply with the court's January 17, 2020 order #7 . The motion is granted. Plaintiff has until March 19, 2020, to submit a renewed in forma pauperis application or pay the statutory filing fee of $400. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 2/18/2020:notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER : Plaintiff's amended application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by February 18, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. In order to facilitate compliance with the directives in this order, the Clerk of Court is further directed to forward a copy of this order to the inmate trust account office at Thomson. [See STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/17/2020. Mailed notice (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#6) ORDER : Plaintiff's amended application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by February 18, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. In order to facilitate compliance with the directives in this order, the Clerk of Court is further directed to forward a copy of this order to the inmate trust account office at Thomson. [See STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/17/2020. Mailed notice (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 10, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/3/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#3

(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 10, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/3/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) RECEIVED COMPLAINT by Carlton Theodore Landis; (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Change of Address by CARLTON THEODORE LANDIS (ztd) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/19/2021. (DM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) SUMMONS (6) Issued as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL TOBACCO AND FIREMARMS AND EXPLOSIVES, EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, sent to US Marshall Service. (adh, ) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-50290. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TRANSFERRED to the District of Columbia the electronic record. (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ENTERED JUDGMENT on 2/17/2021:Electronic/mailed notice(sb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER: Plaintiff has responded to the court's December 17, 2020, show cause order #25 , as required, with a motion to transfer venue #26 . The court finds that under FOIA, 5 U.S.C. 552, et seq., this court lacks jurisdiction to hear this case and that a transfer of venue is discretionary and is appropriate in the interests of justice. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion #26 is granted and this case is transferred to the District of Columbia for all further matters. The clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith to the District Court for the District of Columbia. This matter is closed on the court's docket and the clerk is directed to terminate this case. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 2/17/2021:notice mailed by judicial staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION by Plaintiff Carlton Theodore Landis to change venue (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSent Copy of 12/17/2020 Order To Fiscal Department And Inmate Trust Fund Account Office At AUSP (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/17/2020: Plaintiff's revised application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #21 is granted and the initial partial filing fee is waived. While the initial, partial filing fee is waived, plaintiff remains responsible for payment of the full $350.00 filing fee in this case. Plaintiff's motion to compel #15 is denied because the court has the information necessary to determine plaintiff's financial status. The court directs the Clerk of Court to electronically send a copy of this order to the inmate trust account office at AUSP Thomson and to the court's Fiscal Department. Summons, however, shall not issue. It appears under 5 U.S.C. 552(a)(4)(B) that this court lacks jurisdiction over plaintiff's claims. Thus, plaintiff is ordered to show cause as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Failure to respond to the order to show cause by January 22, 2021, will result in dismissal of this lawsuit for lack of jurisdiction. Mailed/Emailed notice(sb, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The court is in receipt of plaintiff's motion to extend time to comply with the court's January 17, 2020 order #7 . The motion is granted. Plaintiff has until March 19, 2020, to submit a renewed in forma pauperis application or pay the statutory filing fee of $400. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 2/18/2020:notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Plaintiff Carlton Theodore Landis For Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Order (pg, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 2/18/2020) (pg, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMAILED copy of order dated 1/17/20 to the Trust Fund Officer at Thomson Correctional Center (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketMAILED copy of order dated 1/17/2020, a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis to Carlton Landis. (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER : Plaintiff's amended application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by February 18, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. In order to facilitate compliance with the directives in this order, the Clerk of Court is further directed to forward a copy of this order to the inmate trust account office at Thomson. [See STATEMENT] Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 1/17/2020. Mailed notice (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Carlton Theodore Landis for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff must either (1) submit a renewed application that complies with the instructions in this order; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00. Failure to comply with this order by January 10, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the court informed of his address may lead to dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. The Clerk of Court is directed to send plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Philip G. Reinhard on 12/3/2019: notice mailed by Judicial Staff (pg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Carlton Theodore Landis for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED COMPLAINT by Carlton Theodore Landis; (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 3/3/2021.] (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives is a litigant

Latest cases where EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW is a litigant

Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant