This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2020 at 07:27:06 (UTC).

Landau v. KEMET Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Landau filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against KEMET Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00219

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jon F. Landau

Defendants

Karen M. Rogge

Wilfried Backes

Gurminder S. Bedi

E. Erwin Maddrey, II

William Lowe

Jacob Kotzubei

Robert G. Paul

KEMET Corporation

Yasuko Matsumoto

Frank G. Brandenberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Fields

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky LLP

55 Broadway, Ste 10Th Floor, New York

New York, NY 10006

Adam M. Apton

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

55 Broadway, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 MOTION for William J. Fields to Withdraw as Attorney . filed by Jon F. Landau. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED., Attorney William Fields terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/21/2020) (rj) (Entered: 02/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Wilfried Backes, Gurminder S. Bedi, Frank G. Brandenberg, KEMET Corporation, Jacob Kotzubei, William Lowe, E. Erwin Maddrey, II, Yasuko Matsumoto, Robert G. Paul, Karen M. Rogge. Document filed by Jon F. Landau. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Apton, Adam) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Jon F. Landau. Related Document Number: #7 . (Fields, William) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for William J. Fields to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Jon F. Landau..(Fields, William) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/28/2020) (jca) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam M. Apton on behalf of Jon F. Landau. (Apton, Adam) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Wilfried Backes waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Gurminder S. Bedi waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Frank G. Brandenberg waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; KEMET Corporation waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Jacob Kotzubei waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; William Lowe waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; E. Erwin Maddrey, II waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Yasuko Matsumoto waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Robert G. Paul waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020; Karen M. Rogge waiver sent on 1/14/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. Document filed by Jon F. Landau. (Fields, William) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:20-cv-00035-PGG. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul G. Gardephe as possibly related to 20CV00035. (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:20-cv-139 and 1:20-cv-35. Document filed by Jon F. Landau.(Fields, William) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fields, William) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wilfried Backes, Gurminder S. Bedi, Frank G. Brandenberg, KEMET Corporation, Jacob Kotzubei, William Lowe, E. Erwin Maddrey, II, Yasuko Matsumoto, Robert G. Paul, Karen M. Rogge. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18466609)Document filed by Jon F. Landau.(Fields, William) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KEMET Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam M. Apton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Fields