Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/25/2020 at 09:38:23 (UTC).

Landacre v. Mechanical Systems, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 Landacre filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Mechanical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00330

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

travis landacre

Defendants

mechanical systems, inc

Mechanical Systems, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathan James Borland

Attorney at TIMMER & JUDKINS PLLC

Century Ii Building, 1415 28Th Street, Suite 375

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle D. Smid

Attorney at BROWN WINICK LAW FIRM

666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

Brian P Rickert

Attorney at BROWN WINICK LAW FIRM

666 Grand Avenue, Suite 2000

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Supplement Fillable Order

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order) (bam) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 5/24/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 7/26/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (bam) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER adopting #6 REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/29/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/29/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/19/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/23/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 5/21/2021. Discovery Deadline 8/23/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 2/21/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated trial length of 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (bam) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/15/2020) (bam). (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/18/2020) (bam). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#6

(#6) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Borland, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Smid, Danielle) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#3

(#3) Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mechanical Systems, Inc..(Smid, Danielle) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by mechanical systems, inc from Iowa District Court for Dallas County, case number LACV042591. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4285069., filed by mechanical systems, inc. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smid, Danielle) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Fillable Order) (bam) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCES. See Order for particulars. Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 5/24/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Status Conference set for 7/26/2021 11:00 AM in Phone Hearing(HCA). Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. Hearing will be held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (bam) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER adopting #6 REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/29/2020. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/29/2021. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/29/2021. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/19/2021. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/23/2021. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 5/21/2021. Discovery Deadline 8/23/2021. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/24/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Bench Trial set for 2/21/2022 09:00 AM in Des Moines Courthouse before Judge Stephanie M. Rose. Estimated trial length of 5 days. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 12/10/2020. (bam) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/15/2020) (bam). (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/18/2020) (bam). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 12/10/2020. Attorney Nathan James Borland appeared for Plaintiff. Attorney Danielle D. Smid appeared for Defendants. Status of the case discussed. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 11 minutes. (bam) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . (Borland, Nathan) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Mechanical Systems, Inc.. (Smid, Danielle) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 12/10/2020 at 11:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams. Counsel shall call 1-877-336-1829 and enter code 1176783. The Parties shall file a proposed scheduling order and discovery plan pursuant to L.R. 16 by 12/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 11/2/2020. (bam) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mechanical Systems, Inc..(Smid, Danielle) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/25/2020. (kmc) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by mechanical systems, inc from Iowa District Court for Dallas County, case number LACV042591. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4285069., filed by mechanical systems, inc. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smid, Danielle) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle D Smid