Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2020 at 11:26:30 (UTC).

Lancaster v. Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Lancaster filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01957

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Lancaster

Defendant

Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David C Holmes

Attorney at Law Offices of David C. Holmes

13201 Nw Freeway, Suite 800

Houston, TX 77040

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24748005) filed by Scott Lancaster.(Holmes, David) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified. (SusanGramadi, 4) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Healthtrust Workforce Solutions, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24748005) filed by Scott Lancaster.(Holmes, David) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEALTHTRUST WORKFORCE SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C Holmes