This case was last updated from PACER on 06/19/2020 at 09:04:03 (UTC).

Lambirth, et al. v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 Lambirth filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against USAA Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00193

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hunter Lambirth

Rachael Lambirth

Defendants

Business Entity Does 1 through X, and Does I through X

USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth L Pedersen

Attorney at PEDERSEN & JACKSON

Po Box 2349

Twin Falls, ID 83303-2349

Jarom A Whitehead

Attorney at PEDERSEN & WHITEHEAD

Po Box 2349

Twin Falls, ID 83303-2349

Michael J Hanby, II

Attorney at Pedersen and Whitehead

Pob 2349

Twin Falls, ID 83303-2349

Defendant Attorneys

Jaclyn Terese Gans

Attorney at Elam & Burke, P.A.

251 E Front St., Ste. 300, P.O. Box 1539

Boise, ID 83701

Matthew L Walters

Attorney at ELAM & BURKE

Po Box 1539

Boise, ID 83701-1539

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Gans, Jaclyn)

#5

(#5) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before July 1, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

4 #5

Notice of Service of Discovery

4 #4

Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery to USAA

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial

4 #1

Notice of Service of Process

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal State Court Docket Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service of Process, #2 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Summons, #4 Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery to USAA, #5 Notice of Service of Discovery)(Gans, Jaclyn)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Hunter Lambirth and Rachael Lambirth, and counsel for USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/22/2020. (jd)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Gans, Jaclyn)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Affidavit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Ada County, case number CV01-20-03885.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2038609.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Sheet)(Gans, Jaclyn)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Gans, Jaclyn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • Docket(#6) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (jd) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - On or before July 1, 2020, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENT by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal State Court Docket Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service of Process, #2 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #3 Summons, #4 Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery to USAA, #5 Notice of Service of Discovery)(Gans, Jaclyn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Hunter Lambirth and Rachael Lambirth, and counsel for USAA Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/22/2020. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE/PROCESS ASSUMED EXECUTED - All Defendants. (no service document on file, service assumed for internal reporting purpose only) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number #1 Notice of Removal was filed incorrectly in this case. All state court documents shall be individual attachments to the Notice of Removal. For example: Attachment 1) Complaint Attachment 2) State Court Docket Attachment 3) Service Documents Attachment 4) Any answers Attachment 5) Pending Motions. Please resubmit all state court documents only. Please be sure to include the state court docket sheet. When re-filing the state court documents in ECF use the event "Supplement".(jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Gans, Jaclyn)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial District, Ada County, case number CV01-20-03885.(Filing fee $400 receipt number0976-2038609.) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Cover Sheet)(Gans, Jaclyn)

    Read MoreRead Less