This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 11:22:27 (UTC).

Lamb v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 Lamb filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01063

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Lamb

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter H Burke

Defendant Attorney

Grace Robinson Murphy

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by James Lamb.(SRD) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by James Lamb. (Burke, Peter) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America via certified U.S. Mail on this the 26th day of August, 2022. (JLC) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lamb. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (JLC) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 10/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: The Court GRANTS defendant's motion for extension of time (Doc. #6 ). Defendant's response to Plaintiffs Complaint is due October 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/14/2022. (SRD) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Life Insurance Company of North America (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Lamb. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 8/30/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (JLC) (Entered: 09/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America via certified U.S. Mail on this the 26th day of August, 2022. (JLC) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number B-785 (SRD) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by James Lamb. (Burke, Peter) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4154570. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by James Lamb.(SRD). (Burke, Peter) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America, filed by James Lamb.(SRD) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less