This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2021 at 07:15:30 (UTC).

Lamar Central Outdoor LLC et al v. Department of Transportation

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Lamar Central Outdoor LLC filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Department of Transportation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01194

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lamar TLC Properties Inc

Lamar Central Outdoor LLC

Defendant

Department of Transportation

Cross Claimant

City of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Intervenor

Hearts for Hearing Foundation

11500 Portland Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73120

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William H Hickman

Attorney at Hickman Law Group PLLC

114 E Main St

Norman, OK 73069

Defendant Attorney

Lisa E Endres

Attorney at District Attorney's Ofc-OKC

320 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 505

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Cross Claimant Attorneys

Susan D Randall

Attorney at Municipal Counselor's Office-OKC

200 N Walker Ave, Suite 400

Oklahoma City, OK 73170

Laura McDevitt

Attorney at City of OKC

200 N Walker, Ste 400

Okc, OK 73102

Intervenor Attorneys

Carrie L Vaughn

Attorney at Trimble Law Group PLLC

5510 N Francis Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

Paul D Trimble

Attorney at Trimble Law Group PLLC

5510 N Francis Ave

Oklahoma City, OK 73118

 

Court Documents

#14

13 #9

Exhibit Ex. 9 Form OAC Z-504

13 #8

Exhibit Ex. 8 10-24-2018 ODOT Letter

13 #7

Exhibit Ex. 7 9-17-2018 ODOT Letter

13 #6

Affidavit Ex. 6 Affidavit of Joanna Smith

13 #5

Exhibit Ex. 5 Complaint in Intervention

13 #4

Exhibit Ex. 4 11-6-2019 ODOT Letter

13 #3

Exhibit Ex. 3 OKC Zoning Opinion

13 #2

Exhibit Ex. 2 Playground photos

13 #1

Exhibit Ex. 1 Sign site proximity

#13

#12

11 #8

Exhibit Ex. 7 to Complaint - Sept. 17, 2018 ODOT Letter

11 #7

Exhibit Ex. 6 to Complaint - OAC 730:35-5-3 Definitions

11 #4

Exhibit Ex. 3 to Complaint - Moratorium Ordinance

11 #3

Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint - Muni Code 3-146

11 #2

Exhibit Ex. 1 to Complaint - OKC Zoning Opinion

11 #1

Exhibit 1. Cross-Complaint in Intervention

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ENTRY of Appearance by Paul D Trimble on behalf of Hearts for Hearing Foundation (Trimble, Paul) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Intervene by Hearts for Hearing Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Sign site proximity, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Playground photos, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 OKC Zoning Opinion, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 11-6-2019 ODOT Letter, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Complaint in Intervention, #6 Affidavit Ex. 6 Affidavit of Joanna Smith, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 9-17-2018 ODOT Letter, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 10-24-2018 ODOT Letter, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 Form OAC Z-504)(Vaughn, Carrie) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ENTRY of Appearance by Carrie L Vaughn on behalf of Hearts for Hearing Foundation (Vaughn, Carrie) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Intervene by City of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Cross-Complaint in Intervention, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Complaint - OKC Zoning Opinion, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Complaint - Muni Code 3-146, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Complaint - Moratorium Ordinance, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Complaint - Moratorium Ordinance and Extension, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Complaint - OAC 730:35-5-12 Class "A" Signs, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Complaint - OAC 730:35-5-3 Definitions, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Complaint - Sept. 17, 2018 ODOT Letter, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Complaint - Oct. 24, 2018 ODOT Letter, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Complaint - Building Permit Application, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Complaint - Commercial Building Permit, #12 Exhibit Ex. 11 to Complaint - Certificate of Use and Occupancy)(Randall, Susan) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Laura McDevitt on behalf of City of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma (McDevitt, Laura) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Susan D Randall on behalf of City of Oklahoma City, Oklahoma (Randall, Susan) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Hickman, William) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Hickman, William) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by William H Hickman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hickman, William) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 2/4/2021 09:45 AM before Honorable Scott L. Palk. Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (md) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint Removed from State Court by Department of Transportation.(Endres, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa E Endres on behalf of All Defendants (Endres, Lisa) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Receipt for Money Received from Department of Transportation in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500082980 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (knt) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2020-5370 filed by Department of Transportation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Petition in Lamar v ODOT, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons in Lamar v ODOT, #3 Exhibit 3 - Special Entry of Appearance by Def in Lamar v. ODOT, #4 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Lisa Erickson Endres, Attorney for Def. in Lamar v. ODOT, #5 Exhibit 5 - OSCN State Court Docket Sheet in Lamar v. ODOT, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant