This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:55:30 (UTC).

Lam et al v. Trinity Foundation Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Lam filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Trinity Foundation Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00031

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios

Carlos Enrique Luna Lam

Defendants

Pete Evans

Trinity Foundation, Inc.

Trinity Foundation Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andres Correa

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael K Hurst

Attorney at Lynn Pinker Cox & Hurst LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2700

Dallas, TX 75201

Lan P Vu

Attorney at Harder LLP

132 S Rodeo Drive, 4Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Charles J Harder

Attorney at Harder LLP

132 South Rodeo Drive, Fourth Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Ryan J Stonerock

Attorney at Harder LLP

132 S Rodeo Drive, 4Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-2413

Defendant Attorneys

Alison H Moore

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

700 N Pearl St 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201-2832

Thomas Annis

Attorney at Thompson Coe Cousins & Irons

700 North Pearl, 25Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Pete Evans answer due 3/11/2020; Trinity Foundation Inc answer due 3/11/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/20/2020) (axm) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for "Second" Extension filed by Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER: This Order addresses Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint [ECF No. #14 ]. The Court grants the Motion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 2/19/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/24/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison H Moore for Thomas J. Annis on behalf of Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc. (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison H Moore on behalf of Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#8

(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10549702) filed by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Ryan J Stonerock added to party Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan J Stonerock added to party Carlos Enrique Luna Lam(pty:pla) (Stonerock, Ryan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

7 #1

Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#7

(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Charles J. Harder (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10549623) filed by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Vu, Lan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice

#6

(#6) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10549515) filed by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Lan P Vu added to party Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios(pty:pla), Attorney Lan P Vu added to party Carlos Enrique Luna Lam(pty:pla) (Vu, Lan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pete Evans, served on 1/8/2020; Trinity Foundation Inc, served on 1/8/2020. (axm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

1 #2

Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Persons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Carlos Enrique Luna Lam. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10522876) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Persons) (Hurst, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Second Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Pete Evans answer due 3/11/2020; Trinity Foundation Inc answer due 3/11/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 2/20/2020) (axm) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer for "Second" Extension filed by Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER: This Order addresses Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint [ECF No. #14 ]. The Court grants the Motion. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 2/19/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/24/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison H Moore for Thomas J. Annis on behalf of Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc. (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison H Moore on behalf of Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Moore, Alison) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan J. Stonerock ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/23/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles J. Harder ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/23/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER. The Court grants #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lan P. Vu ("Applicant"). Unless already registered or otherwise excused, Applicant is instructed to register as an ECF User within 14 days pursuant to N.D. Tex. Civ. R. 5.1(f). (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 1/23/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10549702) filed by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Ryan J Stonerock added to party Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan J Stonerock added to party Carlos Enrique Luna Lam(pty:pla) (Stonerock, Ryan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Charles J. Harder (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10549623) filed by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Vu, Lan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-10549515) filed by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Attorney Lan P Vu added to party Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios(pty:pla), Attorney Lan P Vu added to party Carlos Enrique Luna Lam(pty:pla) (Vu, Lan) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Pete Evans, served on 1/8/2020; Trinity Foundation Inc, served on 1/8/2020. (axm) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Pete Evans, Trinity Foundation Inc. (oyh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Iglesia Cristiana Casa De Dios, Carlos Enrique Luna Lam. (See document #1 for image) (oyh) . (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Carlos Enrique Luna Lam. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10522876) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Interested Persons) (Hurst, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.