This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 08:03:17 (UTC).

Lam et al v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Lam filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00887

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crystal Lam

Nina Phan

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adam J Zapala

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

840 Malcom Rd Ste 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Elizabeth Tran Castillo

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

840 Malcom Rd Ste 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Kaiyi A Xie

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

840 Malcom Rd Ste 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Reid Wilson Wayman Gaa

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

840 Malcom Rd Ste 200

Burlingame, CA 94010

Karin Bornstein Swope

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP (SEATTLE)

7511 Greenwood Ave N, Ste 4057

Seattle, WA 98103

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

28 #1

*Restricted*

28 #28

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

27 #1

CTO email

27 #27

Main Document

#26

(#26) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 9/2/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#25

(#25) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ; by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#23

(#23) Second Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#8

(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kaiyi A. Xie FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223835 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth T. Castillo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223829 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#6

(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam J. Zapala FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223816 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#3

(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#2

(#2) PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) (Swope, Karin) Modified on 8/24/2021 Document filed in error using wrong event, struck at counsels request (JF). [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01137. (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 9/2/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ; by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION AND SECOND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re Parties' #23 Stipulated Motion. T-Mobile's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended for a total of 60 days through December 17, 2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Second Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) DECLARATION of Kristine McAlister Brown filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc re #21 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Action by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER re Parties' #17 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. The Court orders that the deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/18/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Reid W. Gaa FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223844 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kaiyi A. Xie FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223835 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elizabeth T. Castillo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223829 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Adam J. Zapala FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7223816 (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketJudge Robert S. Lasnik added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Crystal Lam, Nina Phan (Swope, Karin) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) (Swope, Karin) Modified on 8/24/2021 Document filed in error using wrong event, struck at counsels request (JF). [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7220133) Attorney Karin Bornstein Swope added to party Crystal Lam(pty:pla), Attorney Karin Bornstein Swope added to party Nina Phan(pty:pla), filed by Crystal Lam, Nina Phan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Swope, Karin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/24/2021 to replace malformed PDF) (MET). [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steve Y Koh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kathleen M O'Sullivan