Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/14/2021 at 10:51:35 (UTC).

LAKHANI v. MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 LAKHANI filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jose E. Martinez and Jacqueline Becerra. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-21440

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jose E. Martinez

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Becerra

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMIN LAKHANI

Defendants

HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC

MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC doing business as A-Loft Miami-Brickell Hotel

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. doing business as A-Loft Miami-Brickell Hotel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glenn R Goldstein

Attorney at Morales, Goldstein & Barducci, PLLC

150 Se 2Nd Ave, Ste. 805

Miami, FL 33131

Lauren Nicole Wassenberg

1825 Nw Corporate Blvd, Suite 110

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Defendant Attorney

Veronica Mae Rabinowitz

Attorney at Trembly Law Firm

9700 South Dixie Hwy, Penthouse 1100

Miami, FL 33156

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 5/5/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.)(Mediation Deadline 3/10/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#15

(#15) Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand on all claims so triable by HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#14

(#14) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand on all claims so triable by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#13

(#13) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by AMIN LAKHANI (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Mae Rabinowitz on behalf of MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attorney Veronica Mae Rabinowitz added to party MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Mae Rabinowitz on behalf of HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AMIN LAKHANI. MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AMIN LAKHANI. HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AMIN LAKHANI. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. (jbs) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 5/5/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.)(Mediation Deadline 3/10/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Defendants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand on all claims so triable by HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand on all claims so triable by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by AMIN LAKHANI (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Defendant Marriott International, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall file a response on or before June 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/7/2021. (kml) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 9 : All Defendants. (lk) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Mae Rabinowitz on behalf of MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. Attorney Veronica Mae Rabinowitz added to party MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/20/2021 (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Defendants, Mary Brickell Village Hotel, Inc. and HES Group Holding, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before June 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/6/2021. (kml) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica Mae Rabinowitz on behalf of HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC (Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. Attorney Veronica Mae Rabinowitz added to party HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Veronica Mae Rabinowitz added to party MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rabinowitz, Veronica) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AMIN LAKHANI. MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AMIN LAKHANI. HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AMIN LAKHANI. MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. (jbs) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs) Modified text on 4/15/2021 (jbs). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HES GROUP HOLDING, LLC, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., MARY BRICKELL VILLAGE HOTEL, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14607234, filed by AMIN LAKHANI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Wassenberg, Lauren) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Nicole Wassenberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Glenn R Goldstein