Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/25/2020 at 15:37:13 (UTC).

Lakey et al v. Wilson et al

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Lakey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wilson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00152

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cynthia Lakey

Douglas Lakey

Defendants

City of Wilson

David Duggan

Joshua Taylor

Chris Bryant

Brandon Dingman

Frank Shaaf

Wilson, City of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Spencer Bryan

Attorney at Bryan & Terrill Law, PLLC

3015 E Skelly Dr, Ste 400

Tulsa, OK 74105

Steven J. Terrill

Attorney at Bryan & Terrill Law, PLLC

3015 E Skelly Dr, Ste 400

Tulsa, OK 74105

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven J. Terrill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Terrill, Steven) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Frank Shaaf (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to David Duggan (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Bryant(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Carter County) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Bryant(in his individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Dingman (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Joshua Taylor(in his official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Joshua Taylor(in his individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Wilson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

2 #7

Exhibit 7 - Wilson PD

2 #6

Exhibit 6 - Taser Warning

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Incident Report - Duggan

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Incident Report - Taylor

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Body Camera PP

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Radio Log

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chris Bryant(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Carter County and in his individual capacity), Brandon Dingman, David Duggan, Frank Shaaf(in his official capacity and in his individual capacity), Joshua Taylor(in his individual capacity and official capacity), City of Wilson by Cynthia Lakey, Douglas Lakey (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cynthia Lakey, Douglas Lakey (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven J. Terrill on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Terrill, Steven) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Frank Shaaf (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to David Duggan (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Bryant(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Carter County) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chris Bryant(in his individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brandon Dingman (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Joshua Taylor(in his official capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Joshua Taylor(in his individual capacity) (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to City of Wilson (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 5/27/2020 in the amount of $400, receipt number AOKEDC-1368401 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Cynthia Lakey, Douglas Lakey (Bryan, J.) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. ( Filing Fee due by 6/3/2020)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chris Bryant(in his official capacity as Sheriff of Carter County and in his individual capacity), Brandon Dingman, David Duggan, Frank Shaaf(in his official capacity and in his individual capacity), Joshua Taylor(in his individual capacity and official capacity), City of Wilson by Cynthia Lakey, Douglas Lakey (With attachments)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cynthia Lakey, Douglas Lakey (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Spencer Bryan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven James Terrill