This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:43:54 (UTC).

Lakeside Country Club, Inc. v. Granite State Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Lakeside Country Club, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Granite State Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sim Lake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sim Lake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lakeside Country Club, Inc.

Defendants

Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc.

Granite State Insurance Company

Robert Minnie

AIG Claims, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Randall Owen Sorrels

Attorney at Abraham Watkins et al

800 Commerce Street

Houston, TX 77002

Defendant Attorneys

William J Eggleston

Attorney at Eggleston Briscoe LLP

333 Clay Street, Suite 4800

Houston, TX 77002

Raymond L Gregory, II

Attorney at Eggleston Briscoe LLP

333 Clay St, Ste 4800

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE Certificate of Service in Removed Action by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Remand and to Set Briefing Schedule Related to Motion by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Harris County, case number 2019-85936 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23890149) filed by Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., AIG Claims, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1, #2 Exhibit Tab 2, #3 Exhibit Tab 3, #4 Exhibit Tab 4, #5 Exhibit Tab 5, #6 Exhibit Tab 6, #7 Exhibit Tab 7)(Eggleston, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed.(Eggleston, William) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit Tab 2

1 #3

Exhibit Tab 3

#8

(#8) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Lakeside Country Club, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sorrels, Randall) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#4

(#4) First AMENDED ANSWER to by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. (Eggleston, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

9 #1

Proposed Order

10 #1

Proposed Order

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lakeside Country Club, Inc., filed.(Sorrels, Randall) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond L. Gregory II on behalf of AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit Tab 1

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Remand and to Set Briefing Schedule Related to Motion (Responses due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/22/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference (Initial Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Remand and to Set Briefing Schedule Related to Motion (Responses due by 5/11/2020. Replies due by 5/22/2020.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference (Initial Conference set for 5/29/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Motion to Remand and to Set Briefing Schedule Related to Motion by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial and Scheduling Conference by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Opposed MOTION to Remand by Lakeside Country Club, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sorrels, Randall) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Lakeside Country Club, Inc., filed.(Sorrels, Randall) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed.(Eggleston, William) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE Certificate of Service in Removed Action by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First AMENDED ANSWER to by AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. (Eggleston, William) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/28/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond L. Gregory II on behalf of AIG Claims, Inc., Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie, filed. (Gregory, Raymond) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd Harris County, case number 2019-85936 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23890149) filed by Custard Insurance Adjusters, Inc., AIG Claims, Inc., Granite State Insurance Company, Robert Minnie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tab 1, #2 Exhibit Tab 2, #3 Exhibit Tab 3, #4 Exhibit Tab 4, #5 Exhibit Tab 5, #6 Exhibit Tab 6, #7 Exhibit Tab 7)(Eggleston, William) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.