This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2022 at 07:59:29 (UTC).

Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc. v. First Specialty Insurance Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against First Specialty Insurance Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01168

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc.

Defendants

Swiss Re Corporate Solutions

Evanston Insurance Company

Markel Corporation

Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.

Ronald McCartney

Jason McWilliams

Thomas Lang

Envista Forensics, LLC

First Specialty Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alyssa Monet Salinas

Attorney at Williams Hart Boundas Easterby, LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017

Rene M. Sigman

Attorney at Williams Hart Boundas Easterby, LLP

8441 Gulf Freeway, Suite 600

Houston, TX 77017

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Solberg

Attorney at DLA Piper LLP

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 2800

Houston, TX 77002

Steven J. Badger

Attorney at Zelle LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4000

Dallas, TX 75202

Todd M. Tippett

Attorney at Zelle LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4000

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Rule 12 Answer/Other Pleading by Envista Forensics, LLC, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Thomas Lang, Ronald McCartney, Jason McWilliams, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Swiss Re Corporate Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Solberg, Brett) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER on Agreed Dismissal without prejudice of Defendants Markel Corporation and Evanston Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

10 #5

Proposed Order

10 #4

Exhibit D

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF AGREED DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS MARKEL CORPORATION AND EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY by Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Rene M. Sigman (Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Alyssa M. Salinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; The First Specialty Defendants answer due 1/31/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rene M. Sigman for Alyssa M. Salinas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15573765) by on behalf of Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER GRANTING #13 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and Rule 12 Answer/Other Pleading by Envista Forensics, LLC, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Thomas Lang, Ronald McCartney, Jason McWilliams, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Swiss Re Corporate Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Solberg, Brett) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER regarding case style. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER on Agreed Dismissal without prejudice of Defendants Markel Corporation and Evanston Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF AGREED DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS MARKEL CORPORATION AND EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY ONLY by Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address by Rene M. Sigman (Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Alyssa M. Salinas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; The First Specialty Defendants answer due 1/31/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rene M. Sigman for Alyssa M. Salinas ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15573765) by on behalf of Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sigman, Rene) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Envista Forensics, LLC, First Specialty Insurance Corporation, Thomas Lang, Ronald McCartney, Jason McWilliams, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Swiss Re Corporate Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Solberg, Brett) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Directing Alyssa M. Salinas to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Lake Travis Lodges Marina Association, Inc.. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by First Specialty Insurance Corporation (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0542-15559250), filed by First Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Documents Filed in State Court), #2 Exhibit B (Notice Letter), #3 Exhibit C (Election Letter), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Solberg, Brett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/28/2021: #5 Supplement to JS44) (lt). (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Envista Forensics LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Markel Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST SPECIALTY INSURANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant