This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/03/2020 at 09:28:06 (UTC).

LAITY v. HARRIS

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 LAITY filed a Civil Right - Voting Discrimination lawsuit against HARRIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02511

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Voting Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERT C. LAITY

Tonawanda, NY 14150-5217

Defendant

KAMALA DEVI HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin John Razi

Attorney at COVINGTON & BURLING LLP

850 Tenth Street, Nw, One City Center

Washington, DC 20001

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by ROBERT C. LAITY. (zjf) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by KAMALA DEVI HARRIS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Razi, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin John Razi on behalf of KAMALA DEVI HARRIS (Razi, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. KAMALA DEVI HARRIS served on 9/28/2020 (zjf) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 09/29/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/29/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/28/2020.) (zjf) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ROBERT C. LAITY re #2 STANDING ORDER. (zjf) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 09/17/20. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS (3) Issued as to KAMALA DEVI HARRIS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zjf) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KAMALA DEVI HARRIS ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616104076) filed by ROBERT C. LAITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin John Razi