This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/08/2021 at 20:48:06 (UTC).

Laird v. AT&T Inc

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 Laird filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03734

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lora Lee Laird

Defendant

AT&T Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hal K Gillespie

Attorney at Gillespie Sanford LLP

4803 Gaston Avenue

Dallas, TX 75246

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Lora Lee Laird. (Gillespie, Hal) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to AT&T Inc ; served on 12/30/2020. (oyh) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc. (jmg) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lora Lee Laird identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate AT&T Inc for AT&T Inc. (Gillespie, Hal) Modified text on 12/29/2020 (jmg). (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Lora Lee Laird. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11470868) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Gillespie, Hal) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hal K Gillespie