This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:54:00 (UTC).

Laing et al v. City of Blue Springs, Missouri

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Laing filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against City of Blue Springs, Missouri. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Greg Kays. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00967

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Kays

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Christina Laing

Jessica Smith

Defendant

City of Blue Springs, Missouri

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nichelle L Oxley

Attorney at Humphrey, Farrington, & McClain, PC

221 West Lexington, Suite 400, P. O. Box 900

Independence, MO 64051

Andrew K Smith

Attorney at Humphrey, Farrington, & McClain, PC

221 West Lexington, Suite 400, P. O. Box 900

Independence, MO 64051

Defendant Attorneys

Wesley J. Carrillo

Attorney at Ensz & Jester, PC

2121 City Center Square, 1100 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105

Christopher M Napolitano

Attorney at Ensz & Jester, PC

2121 City Center Square, 1100 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105

Brandon Dale Mizner

Attorney at Ensz & Jester, PC

2121 City Center Square, 1100 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105

Matthew Justin Gist

Attorney at Ensz & Jester, PC

2121 City Center Square, 1100 Main Street

Kansas City, MO 64105

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 11:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 1/23/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Nichelle L Oxley on behalf of Plaintiffs Christina Laing, Jessica Smith.(Oxley, Nichelle) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Christina Laing, Jessica Smith. (Oxley, Nichelle) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew Justin Gist on behalf of Defendant City of Blue Springs, Missouri.(Gist, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of City of Blue Springs, Missouri.(Gist, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/7/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/21/2020. Signed on 12/4/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-cv29923, City of Blue Springs, Missouri. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6612863. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Gist, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 1/26/2021 11:00 AM via telephone conference initiated by Plaintiff's counsel. Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8D, Kansas City (DGK) before District Judge Greg Kays. Signed on 1/23/2020 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Nichelle L Oxley on behalf of Plaintiffs Christina Laing, Jessica Smith.(Oxley, Nichelle) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Christina Laing, Jessica Smith. (Oxley, Nichelle) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Matthew Justin Gist on behalf of Defendant City of Blue Springs, Missouri.(Gist, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of City of Blue Springs, Missouri.(Gist, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 1/7/2020. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/21/2020. Signed on 12/4/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1916-cv29923, City of Blue Springs, Missouri. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6612863. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Gist, Matthew) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less