This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 08:07:53 (UTC).

Laible et al v. Lanter et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 Laible filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lanter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David L. Bunning and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Bunning

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven Klein

Maribeth Klein

Defendants

Timothy Lanter

Brett Thomas

Donald Scalf

City of Cincinnati

Mason Meyer

Austin Lagory

Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America

Executor

Jason Laible

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James Stephen Smith

Attorney at Graydon, Head & Ritchey, LLP - KY

2400 Chamber Center Drive, Suite 300

Ft. Mitchell, KY 41017

Roula Allouch

Attorney at Graydon, Head & Ritchey LLP - OH

312 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Defendant Attorneys

Spencer S. Cowan

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius & Hollister, LLP - Cincinnati OH

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Aaron Herzig

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius & Hollister, LLP - Cincinnati OH

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Chad R. Ziepfel

Attorney at Taft, Stettinius & Hollister, LLP - Cincinnati OH

425 Walnut Street, Suite 1800

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Michael P. Casey

Attorney at Casey, Bailey & Maines, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 200

Lexington, KY 40513

Executor Attorneys

Alphonse A. Gerhardstein

Attorney at Friedman, Gilbert & Gerhardstein, LLC

441 Vine Street, Suite 3400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Jacqueline Greene

Attorney at Friedman, Gilbert & Gerhardstein, LLC

441 Vine Street, Suite 3400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Rebecca P. Salley

Attorney at Friedman, Gilbert & Gerhardstein, LLC

441 Vine Street, Suite 3400

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

11 #1

Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Proposed Order

10 #1

Attachment Declaration of Mark Manning

10 #10

Main Document

8 #1

Proposed Order

8 #8

Main Document

#4

#3

1 #6

Travelers Answer to Complaint

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Ex 4-Declaration of Brett Thomas

1 #3

Ex 3-Declaration of Timothy Lanter

1 #2

Ex 2-Declaration of Donald Scalf

1 #1

Ex 1-State Court Record

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: re #8 MOTION to Remand by Maribeth Klein, Steven Klein, Jason Laible , #10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas Defendants City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Brett Thomas, and Donald Scalf's Motion to Dismiss (TJZ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Cincinnati, #11 MOTION to Stay by City of Cincinnati. (TJZ) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand by Maribeth Klein, Steven Klein, Jason Laible filed by Maribeth Klein, Steven Klein, Jason Laible. (Gerhardstein, Alphonse) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY BRIEF to #10 , #11 Defendants City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Brett Thomas, and Donald Scalf's Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Stay and Motion to Dismiss filed by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas. (Ziepfel, Chad) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand by Maribeth Klein, Steven Klein, Jason Laible Defendants Timothy Lanter, Brett Thomas, and Donald Scalf's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas. (Ziepfel, Chad) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Spencer S. Cowan: re 14 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A PHV e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Spencer S. Cowan. (SLG) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting #6 MOTION for Spencer S. Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendants Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas, and the City of Cincinnati, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 09/22/2021. (SLG)cc: COR and Spencer C. Cowan by US Mail (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE FOR ATTORNEY TO REQUEST E-Filing Privileges to Aaron M. Herzig: re 13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A PHV e-Filing request must be processed through your PACER account. IMPORTANT NOTICE: You are required to electronically file and receive electronic service from the court's automated Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system. If you are not a registered Filing User for the Court's ECF system, please visit the Court's website at www.kyed.uscourts.gov for information and/or training. For additional assistance contact the Help Desk at 1-866-485-6349. cc: COR and via U.S. Mail to Aaron M. Herzig. (SLG) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) VIRTUAL ORDER: Granting #5 MOTION for Aaron M. Herzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice as co-counsel on behalf of Defendants Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas, and the City of Cincinnati, the requirements of Joint Local Civil Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 09/22/2021. (SLG)cc: COR (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas Defendants City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Brett Thomas, and Donald Scalf's Motion to Dismiss, #11 MOTION to Stay by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas Defendants City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Brett Thomas, and Donald Scalf's Motion to Stay filed by Maribeth Klein, Steven Klein, Jason Laible. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 CPD Pursuit Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 CPD Policy 10.000)(Gerhardstein, Alphonse) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ziepfel, Chad) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #5 MOTION for Aaron M. Herzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5052062), #6 MOTION for Spencer S. Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5052067) (TJZ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBAR STATUS Check completed re #5 MOTION for Aaron M. Herzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5052062), #6 MOTION for Spencer S. Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5052067). (TJZ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Spencer S. Cowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5052067)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer S. Cowan, #2 Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Ziepfel, Chad) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Aaron M. Herzig to Appear Pro Hac Vice by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-5052062)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Aaron M. Herzig, #2 Ohio Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Ziepfel, Chad) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by City of Cincinnati, Timothy Lanter, Donald Scalf, Brett Thomas. (Ziepfel, Chad) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketConflict Check run. (TJZ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) This case is referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. 2) The Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and to rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive or Daubert motions will be referred to the undersigned. The final pretrial and trial will be before the undersigned. 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties shall attempt to resolve the disputes between themselves; (2) if parties are unable to resolve disputes, they shall arrange telephone conference with Magistrate Judge; (3) if parties unable to resolve dispute, they may file appropriate motion. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011 (TJZ)cc: COR (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, filed as part of state court record. (TJZ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00595. ( Filing fee $402; receipt number 0643-5051744), filed by Defendants Scalf, Lanter, Thomas, City of Cincinnati. (Attachments: #1 Ex 1-State Court Record, #2 Ex 2-Declaration of Donald Scalf, #3 Ex 3-Declaration of Timothy Lanter, #4 Ex 4-Declaration of Brett Thomas, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Travelers Answer to Complaint)(TJZ) Modified text on 8/26/2021 (TJZ). (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer S Cowan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chad Robert Ziepfel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael P. Casey