This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2019 at 07:55:54 (UTC).

LAGOS v. WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 LAGOS filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are CATHERINE C. EAGLES and JOE L. WEBSTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00816

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CATHERINE C. EAGLES

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CECILIA V. LAGOS

Winston Salem, NC 27103

Defendant

WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

STACY K. WOOD

Attorney at PARKER POE ADAMS & BERNSTEIN

Three Wachovia Ctr., 401 S. Tryon St., Ste. 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

SARAH K. DOUGLAS

Attorney at PARKER POE ADAMS & BERNSTEIN

Three Wells Fargo Ctr., 401 S. Tryon St., Ste. 3000

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/20/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (DOUGLAS, SARAH) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK identifying Corporate Parent WOODFOREST FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. for WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK.. (WOOD, STACY) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond t

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint)(WOOD, STACY) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STACY K. WOOD on behalf of Defendant WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK (WOOD, STACY) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

#7

(#7) USMS Return Executed on 08/27/2019. Answer due by 9/17/2019. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

6 #1

Magistrate Consent Form

#6

(#6) Notice of Right to Consent. US Marshal shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 08/13/2019, that plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK, filed by CECILIA V. LAGOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by CECILIA V. LAGOS. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 11/20/2019 09:30 AM in Durham Courtroom #1 before MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Garrett, Kim) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (DOUGLAS, SARAH) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Answer updated for WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK to 10/8/2019. (Contreras, Jamie) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. For good cause shown, Defendant Woodforest National Bank shall have up to and including October 8, 2019 in which to file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 9/11/2019.(Lee, Pedra) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions Referred: RE: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER (Sanders, Marlene) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK identifying Corporate Parent WOODFOREST FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. for WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK.. (WOOD, STACY) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer/Respond to Complaint)(WOOD, STACY) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SARAH K. DOUGLAS on behalf of Defendant WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK (DOUGLAS, SARAH) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STACY K. WOOD on behalf of Defendant WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK (WOOD, STACY) (Entered: 09/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) USMS Return Executed on 08/27/2019. Answer due by 9/17/2019. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Right to Consent. US Marshal shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster on 08/13/2019, that plaintiff is permitted to commence said proceeding in this Court without prepayment of fees or costs, or giving security therefor. Plaintiff is responsible for preparing and delivering to the Clerk, the correct summons for service on each defendant. Failure to prepare and deliver said summons within 15 days from the filing of this order shall result in this case being dismissed without further notice. The U.S. Marshal shall serve the summons and complaint upon defendant. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion Referred to Magistrate Judge Joe L. Webster RE: #1 APPLICATION to Proceed IFP. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Case assigned to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against WOODFOREST NATIONAL BANK, filed by CECILIA V. LAGOS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by CECILIA V. LAGOS. (Coyne, Michelle) (Entered: 08/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.