This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2020 at 10:50:58 (UTC).

LAGO v. QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 LAGO filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen M. Williams and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-08377

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen M. Williams

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cintia Lago

Defendants

QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC

QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC doing business as QAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIG B. SANDERS

Attorney at BARSHAY SANDERS PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorneys

RICHARD J. PERR

Attorney at KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK LLP

Four Penn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1030

Philadelphia, PA 19103

GRAEME E. HOGAN

Attorney at KAUFMAN DOLOWICH & VOLUCK LLP

Four Pwnn Center, 1600 John F. Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 1030

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Initial Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 8/28/2020. (dmr) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC.(PERR, RICHARD) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/26/2020. (dmr) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Complaint. Attorney GRAEME E. HOGAN for QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC added. (HOGAN, GRAEME) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CINTIA LAGO. (SANDERS, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CINTIA LAGO. QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (SANDERS, CRAIG) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Caption,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketJudge Noel L. Hillman and Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams added. (dd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11039837) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Cintia Lago. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(SANDERS, CRAIG) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QUALITY ASSET RECOVERY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAEME E. HOGAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard J. Perr Esq.