This case was last updated from PACER on 07/20/2021 at 14:55:44 (UTC).

Lafourche Parish School Board v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Lafourche Parish School Board filed an Other lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45036

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Impax Laboratories, LLC

Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.

West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.

Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.

Walmart Inc.

H.D. Smith LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H D Smith Wholesale Drug Co

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Allergan Limited

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC

McKesson Corporation

Allergan Sales, LLC

Actavis Kadian LLC

Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corp.

Actavis Totowa LLC

Actavis Elizabeth LLC

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Natalie J. Dekaris

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

C. William Bradley, Jr.

Attorney at Bradley, Murchison, Kelly & Shea

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Leland G Horton

Attorney at Bradley Murchison

401 Edwards Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

Kathryn Marie Knight

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

James Dalton Courson

Attorney at Stone, Pigman, Walther, Wittmann

909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Richard Munice Crump

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Shelley K. Napolitano

Attorney at Maron Marvel Bradley & Anderson

201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Douglas John Moore

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kelly Juneau Rookard

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Shannon Marie Jaeckel

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore

400 Convention Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

W. Michael Adams

Attorney at Blanchard, Walker, O'Quin & Roberts

333 Texas Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

James A. Brown

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70139-5099

Madison Sharko

Attorney at Barrasso, Usdin, Kupperman, Freeman & Sarver

2350 L L& E Tower, 909 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Other Attorneys

John F. Olinde

Attorney at Chaffe McCall

1100 Poydras Street

New Orleans, LA 70163

Walter John Leger, Jr.

Attorney at Leger & Shaw

935 Gravier Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

Glenn Michael Farnet

Attorney at Kean, Miller, Hawthorne, D'Armond, McCowan & Jarman

22Nd Floor, One American Place

Baton Rouge, LA 70821-3513

Franklin J. Foil

Attorney at Ste. 240

412 N Fourth Street

Baton Rouge, LA 70802

Russell R. Dickson

Attorney at Wiener, Weiss & Madison

330 Marshall Street

Shreveport, LA 71101

Kerry J. Miller

Attorney at Fishman Haygood - New Orleans

46Th Floor, 201 St. Charles Avenue

New Orleans, LA 70170

Franklin G. Shaw

Attorney at Leger & Shaw

935 Gravier Street

New Orleans, LA 70112

18 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Amended complaint SHORT FORM FOR SUPPLEMENTING COMPLAINT AND AMENDING DEFENDANTS AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants. Filed by Lafourche Parish School Board. (Landry, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

#12

(#12) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (cwa) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant, McKesson Corporation, without waiver of any defenses, shall have through and including 90 days from filing of this motion to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/25/2021. (cwa) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKesson Corporation. (lt) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Amended complaint SHORT FORM FOR SUPPLEMENTING COMPLAINT AND AMENDING DEFENDANTS AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants. Filed by Lafourche Parish School Board. (Landry, Matthew) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:21-cv-00296. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order of MDL Transfer to District of Northern District of Ohio. MDL case number is 2804. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(cwa) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2804. (cwa) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Notice (Other). Attachment was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (cwa) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE/NOTICE of Supplemental Notice of Removal as to #1 Notice of Removal by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kippers, Shannon) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (cwa). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/1/2021) (cwa). [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant, McKesson Corporation, without waiver of any defenses, shall have through and including 90 days from filing of this motion to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/25/2021. (cwa) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Compliance by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lafourche Parish School Board. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Remand to State Court, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Landry, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by McKesson Corporation. (lt) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by McKesson Corporation (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by McKesson Corporation of Collateral Proceedings. (Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 17th Judicial District Court, case number 141737 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8731647) filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Record)Attorney Stacey Denise Williams added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft).(Williams, Stacey) [Transferred from laed on 3/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS Tennessee Distribution, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where IMPAX Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where H.D. Smith, LLC is a litigant