This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2022 at 05:46:45 (UTC).

Lafond et al v. Mead Johnson & Company, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 Lafond filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Mead Johnson Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04116

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lisa Lafond

Ashley Lafond

Angela Lafond

Defendants

Mead Johnson & Company LLC

Mead Johnson Nutrition Company

Abbott Laboratories

Dignity Health doing business as Mercy Medical Center Redding

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

M. Elizabeth Graham

Attorney at Grant & Eisenhofer

201 Mission St., Suite 1200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Matthew Baum

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

1 Market St. #3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Celeste Marie Brecht

Attorney at Jones Day

555 South Flower Street, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nicholas J. Leonard

Attorney at Low McKinley & Salenko LLP

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 250

Sacramento, CA 95833

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

27 #1

*Restricted*

27 #27

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#26

(#26) MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois. Electronic Case Transfer Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/08/2022)

25 #1

Exhibit

25 #25

Main Document

#24

(#24) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/1/2022 to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. New Case Number is: 2:22-cv-00724-TLN-AC.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

4 #1

Proposed Order

4 #4

Main Document

1 #14

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit K

1 #9

Exhibit H

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #7

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to counsel of record. (nsf, ) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RECEIVED from California Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00724 (nsf,) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MDL ORDER. CASE TRANSFERRED to the Northern District of Illinois. Electronic Case Transfer Sent. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Supplemental Information by Abbott Laboratories re #4 Motion to Stay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/1/2022 to Magistrate Judge Allison Claire for all further proceedings. New Case Number is: 2:22-cv-00724-TLN-AC.(Mena-Sanchez, L) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) Electronically by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Brecht, Celeste) Modified on 7/1/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 2:22-cv-00723-TLN, 2:22-cv-00879-KJM, 2:22-cv-00913-JDP by Lisa Lafond. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Graham, M. Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF LODGING of oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motion to Vacate Conditional Transfer Order to MDL No. 3026 by Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brecht, Celeste) Modified on 6/15/2022 (Mena-Sanchez, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY by Dignity Health re #10 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Strike,. (Leonard, Nicholas) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/25/2022: On the Court's own motion, Defendant Dignity Health's Motion to Dismiss and Strike (ECF No. #10 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 6/30/2022 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be determined at a later date. Defendant may still file a reply brief in accordance with Local Rule 230(d). (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to DISMISS, MOTION to STRIKE.( Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley) by Dignity Health. Attorney Leonard, Nicholas J. added. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities #2 Declaration #3 Request for Judicial Notice #4 Proposed Order (Leonard, Nicholas) Modified on 5/12/2022 (Kaminski, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION by Abbott Laboratories re #4 Motion to Stay. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of COMPLIANCE with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) by Abbott Laboratories re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to REMAND by Lisa Lafond. Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Graham, M. Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Graham, M. Elizabeth) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Abbott Laboratories re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to STAY by Abbott Laboratories. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brecht, Celeste) Modified on 4/29/2022 (Reader, L). [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Abbott Laboratories. (Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Shasta County Superior Court, case number 199399 by Abbott Laboratories. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10202421)((Attachments: #1 Declaration of Celeste M. Brecht, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brecht, Celeste) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/8/2022.] (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEAD JOHNSON NUTRITION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DIGNITY HEALTH doing business as ST. MARY'S MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant