This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/21/2022 at 06:03:13 (UTC).

Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government v. Morbark L L C et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Morbark L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael J Juneau, David C Joseph and Carol B Whitehurst. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

Presiding Judges

Michael J Juneau

David C Joseph

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government

Defendants

Morbark, LLC

W.L. Doggett, LLC

Caterpillar Inc.

Morbark L L C

W L Doggett L L C doing business as Doggett Machinery Services L L C

Caterpillar Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael O Adley

Attorney at Gibson Law Partners

P O Box 52124

Lafayette, LA 70505

Alan W Stewart

Attorney at Gibson Law Partners

P O Box 52124

Lafayette, LA 70505

Defendant Attorneys

Deirdre C McGlinchey

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford (NO)

601 Poydras Ste 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Paul Michael Lavelle

Attorney at Cotten Schmidt (NO)

650 Poydras St Ste 1950

New Orleans, LA 70130

Sarah Perkins Reid

Attorney at Cotten Schmidt (NO)

650 Poydras St Ste 1950

New Orleans, LA 70130

Vanessa W Anseman

127 Elysian Fields Dr

Lafayette, LA 70508

Michael Herold Ishee

Attorney at Liskow & Lewis (LAF)

P O Box 52008 O C S

Lafayette, LA 70505

Patrick J O'Cain

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford (NO)

601 Poydras Ste 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

Farren Lorraine Davis

Attorney at McGlinchey Stafford (NO)

601 Poydras Ste 1200

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by W L Doggett L L C. (aty,Anseman, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/29/2022. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/29/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/26/2022. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/26/2022. Discovery deadline 11/25/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2022. Daubert Motions due by 11/25/2022. Motions in Limine due by 2/8/2023. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/24/2023. Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2023. Trial Depositions due by 2/16/2023. Bench Books due by 3/6/2023. Real Time glossary due by 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 2/22/2022. (crt,Roaix, G) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#15

(#15) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Answer to Complaint sent to Vanessa W Anseman on behalf of W L Doggett L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/23/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by W L Doggett L L C.(aty,Anseman, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morbark L L C identifying Corporate Parent Alamo Group Inc, Other Affiliate Alamo Group (USA) Inc for Morbark L L C. (aty,Lavelle, Paul) Modified docket text on 2/9/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Morbark L L C.(Attorney Paul Michael Lavelle added to party Morbark L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Lavelle, Paul) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar Inc.(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. W L Doggett L L C answer due 2/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/26/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

6 #2

Local Rule 7.9 Certificate

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by W L Doggett L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 7.9 Certificate)(Attorney Michael Herold Ishee added to party W L Doggett L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Ishee, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

5 #1

Exhibit State Court record as of 1/21/22

#5

(#5) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Caterpillar Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court record as of 1/21/22)(aty,O'Cain, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #3

Exhibit Notices of Consent to Removal

1 #2

Exhibit State Court petition

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2021-6667 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4963620) filed by Caterpillar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State Court petition, #3 Notices of Consent to Removal)(Attorney Deirdre C McGlinchey added to party Caterpillar Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by W L Doggett L L C. (aty,Anseman, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 2 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/29/2022. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/29/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/26/2022. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/26/2022. Discovery deadline 11/25/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2022. Daubert Motions due by 11/25/2022. Motions in Limine due by 2/8/2023. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/24/2023. Pretrial Order due by 2/16/2023. Trial Depositions due by 2/16/2023. Bench Books due by 3/6/2023. Real Time glossary due by 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 2/22/2022. (crt,Roaix, G) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 2/17/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 10:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC ORDER - A telephone scheduling conference is hereby SET for February 17, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall access the call by dialing 877-336-1839, access code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 2/9/2022. (crt,Coreil, H) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Answer to Complaint sent to Vanessa W Anseman on behalf of W L Doggett L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/23/2022. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by W L Doggett L L C.(aty,Anseman, Vanessa) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Morbark L L C identifying Corporate Parent Alamo Group Inc, Other Affiliate Alamo Group (USA) Inc for Morbark L L C. (aty,Lavelle, Paul) Modified docket text on 2/9/2022 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Morbark L L C.(Attorney Paul Michael Lavelle added to party Morbark L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Lavelle, Paul) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. This matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge David C Joseph. Judge Michael J Juneau no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/1/2022. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Caterpillar Inc.(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. W L Doggett L L C answer due 2/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/26/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by W L Doggett L L C. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Local Rule 7.9 Certificate)(Attorney Michael Herold Ishee added to party W L Doggett L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Ishee, Michael) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Caterpillar Inc . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court record as of 1/21/22)(aty,O'Cain, Patrick) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 1/20/2022. (crt,Chicola, C) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2022. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caterpillar Inc. (aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number 2021-6667 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4963620) filed by Caterpillar Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State Court petition, #3 Notices of Consent to Removal)(Attorney Deirdre C McGlinchey added to party Caterpillar Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,McGlinchey, Deirdre) Modified on 1/19/2022 to edit text (Jones, P). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lafayette City-Parish Consolidated Government is a litigant

Latest cases where W.L. Doggett, LLC d/b/a Doggett Machinery Services is a litigant

Latest cases where MORBARK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Caterpillar, Inc. is a litigant