Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/16/2021 at 11:50:12 (UTC).

Ladell Taylor v. Penske Logistics, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Ladell Taylor filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Penske Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi, Kenly Kiya Kato, Otis D. Wright, II and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02623

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Mark C. Scarsi

Otis D. Wright, II

Referral Judges

Kenly Kiya Kato

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ladell Taylor

Defendants

Penske Logistics, LLC

Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Vilmarie Cordero

Attorney at GrahamHollis APC

3555 Fifth Avenue Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92103

Monique R Rodriguez

Attorney at GrahamHollis APC

3555 5Th Avenue Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92103

Graham S P Hollis

Attorney at GrahamHollis APC

3555 5Th Avenue Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92103

Hali Michelle Anderson

Attorney at GrahamHollis APC

3555 5Th Avenue Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorneys

Noel M Hicks

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Evan R. Moses

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Evan R Moses

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Paul B. Maslo

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

8117 Preston Road Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint within 7 court days of entry of this Order. Upon the filing of the First Amended Complaint, Defendant Penske TruckLeasing Co., L.P. shall be dismissed without prejudice. Penske Truck LeasingCo., L.P. shall bear its own costs incurred. If Plaintiff receives any information or evidence implicating Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. as a defendant with regard to the claims pled in the First Amended Complaint and that arecurrently at issue in the case, any amendment of the operative complaint toadd Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. will be nunc pro tunc. Defendant Penske Logistics LLC shall have 30 days from the date of service of the First Amended Complaint to file a responsive pleading. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#25

(#25) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On December 23, 2020, the Court ordered the parties to show cause for why this case, Ladell Taylor v. Penske Logistics, LLC et al., No. 5:20-cv-02623-ODW (MRWx), should not be consolidated with related case Angel Zamora et al v. Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. et al., No. 2:20-cv-02503-ODW (MRWx) #17 . The Court is in receipt ofthe parties' responses. (ECF Nos. 2223.) Accordingly, the Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause.In light of the parties' responses, the actions will not be consolidated at this time. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

#21

(#21) ORDER GRANTING AMENDED APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul B. Maslo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. and designating Evan R. Moses as local counsel. #20 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#17

(#23) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ladell Taylorto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Rodriguez, Monique) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02623 MCS (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:20-cv-02623 JWH (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P., (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P.. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

1 #3

Declaration of Evan R. Moses

1 #2

Declaration of Jennifer Diercksmeier

1 #1

Exhibit A to C

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2022481 Receipt No: ACACDC-29608231 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P., Penske Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Diercksmeier, #3 Declaration of Evan R. Moses) (Attorney Evan R. Moses added to party Penske Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan R. Moses added to party Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P.(pty:dft))(Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Does, Penske Logistics, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiff Ladell Taylor (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Rodriguez, Monique) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint within 7 court days of entry of this Order. Upon the filing of the First Amended Complaint, Defendant Penske TruckLeasing Co., L.P. shall be dismissed without prejudice. Penske Truck LeasingCo., L.P. shall bear its own costs incurred. If Plaintiff receives any information or evidence implicating Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. as a defendant with regard to the claims pled in the First Amended Complaint and that arecurrently at issue in the case, any amendment of the operative complaint toadd Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. will be nunc pro tunc. Defendant Penske Logistics LLC shall have 30 days from the date of service of the First Amended Complaint to file a responsive pleading. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On December 23, 2020, the Court ordered the parties to show cause for why this case, Ladell Taylor v. Penske Logistics, LLC et al., No. 5:20-cv-02623-ODW (MRWx), should not be consolidated with related case Angel Zamora et al v. Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. et al., No. 2:20-cv-02503-ODW (MRWx) #17 . The Court is in receipt ofthe parties' responses. (ECF Nos. 2223.) Accordingly, the Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause.In light of the parties' responses, the actions will not be consolidated at this time. (lc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Joint STIPULATION for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ladell Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Joint Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order Granting the Parties' Joint Stipulation for Leave for Plaintiff to File a First Amended Complaint, #3 Declaration of Service)(Rodriguez, Monique) (Entered: 02/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Ladell Taylorto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #17 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Rodriguez, Monique) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RESPONSE filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of PBM ISO Response to OSC, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to PMB Declaration)(Moses, Evan) (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER GRANTING AMENDED APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul B. Maslo to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. and designating Evan R. Moses as local counsel. #20 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P.. Amendment to Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form, #15 Amended Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice #12 as requested in Minute Order #16 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice)(Moses, Evan) Modified on 1/13/2021 (lc). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for April 26, 2021 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul B Maslo on behalf on Defendants. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-02623 MCS (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:20-cv-02623 JWH (KKx). (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT B)(ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50 inclusive, Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Co., L.P. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Ladell Taylor. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/16/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P., (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Penske Logistics, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P.. (Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS2022481 Receipt No: ACACDC-29608231 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P., Penske Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to C, #2 Declaration of Jennifer Diercksmeier, #3 Declaration of Evan R. Moses) (Attorney Evan R. Moses added to party Penske Logistics, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Evan R. Moses added to party Penske Truck Leasing CO., L.P.(pty:dft))(Moses, Evan) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penske Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSKE TRUCK LEASING CO. LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Graham S P Hollis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Monique R Rodriguez