This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/06/2022 at 11:01:51 (UTC).

LACOMBE v. ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 LACOMBE filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Mario Garcia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00699

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Mario Garcia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JESSICA LACOMBE

Defendant

ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

E. Michelle Drake

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1229 Tyler Street Ne, Suite 205

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Joseph C. Hashmall

Attorney at Berger Montague PC

1229 Tyler Street Ne, Suite 205

Minneapolis, MN 55413

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandria Hanauer Pittman

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

George A. Gasper

Attorney at ICE MILLER LLP (Indianapolis)

One American Square, Suite 2900

Indianapolis, IN 46282

Henry M. Perlowski

Attorney at Arnall Golden Gregory LLP

171 17Th Street Nw, Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30363

Megan Poitevint Mitchell

Attorney at Arnall Golden Gregory LLP

171 17Th Street Nw, Ste 2100

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike , filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#17

(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike, filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2022 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/27/2022.(NAD) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Megan P. Mitchell for ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC added SEE MARGINAL ENTRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/27/2022 Copy sent to Ms. Mitchell via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Henry M. Perlowski for ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC added-SEE MARGINAL ENTRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/27/2022 Copy to Mr. Perlowski via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

13 #13

Main Document

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Gasper, George) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Gasper on behalf of Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Gasper, George) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Motions to Appear PHV, Magistrate Notice of Availability served on Diana Ruiz, on behalf of Accurate Background, LLC on 04/12/2022, filed by JESSICA LACOMBE. (Hashmall, Joseph) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney E. Michelle Drake for JESSICA LACOMBE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/8/2022. (CBU) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joseph C. Hashmall for JESSICA LACOMBE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/8/2022. (CBU) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

2 #1

Text of Proposed Order

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike , filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Strike, filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2022 09:30 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia. (See Order.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/27/2022.(NAD) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Megan P. Mitchell for ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC added SEE MARGINAL ENTRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/27/2022 Copy sent to Ms. Mitchell via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Henry M. Perlowski for ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC added-SEE MARGINAL ENTRY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/27/2022 Copy to Mr. Perlowski via US Mail (CBU) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Attorney(s) Megan P. Mitchell to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7076490), filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Attorney(s) Henry M. Perlowski to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7076459), filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Gasper, George) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandria Hanauer Pittman on behalf of Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Pittman, Alexandria) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by George A. Gasper on behalf of Defendant ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (Gasper, George) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Motions to Appear PHV, Magistrate Notice of Availability served on Diana Ruiz, on behalf of Accurate Background, LLC on 04/12/2022, filed by JESSICA LACOMBE. (Hashmall, Joseph) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney E. Michelle Drake for JESSICA LACOMBE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/8/2022. (CBU) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Joseph C. Hashmall for JESSICA LACOMBE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 4/8/2022. (CBU) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JSR) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC. (JSR) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Attorney(s) E. Michelle Drake to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7048693), filed by Plaintiff JESSICA LACOMBE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Drake, E.) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph C. Hashmall to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7048691), filed by Plaintiff JESSICA LACOMBE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hashmall, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ACCURATE BACKGROUND, LLC, filed by JESSICA LACOMBE. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7048685) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hashmall, Joseph) (Entered: 04/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Accurate Background, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George A. Gasper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan P. Mitchell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry M. Perlowski