This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/03/2021 at 21:50:59 (UTC).

Lackie Drug Store Inc v. Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Lackie Drug Store Inc filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is James M. Moody Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01515

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James M. Moody Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lackie Drug Store Inc

Defendants

CVS Health Corporation

Caremark LLC

Express Scripts

OptumRx Inc

CaremarkPCS LLC

ESI Mail Processing Inc

Express Scripts Pharmacy

OptumRx Pharmacy Inc

Pharmaceutical Care Management Association

Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC

MedImpact Healthcare Systems Inc

ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc

MedImpact Direct LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Everett Clarke Tucker, IV

Attorney at Clarke Tucker Law

407 President Clinton Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201

James Clark Wyly

Attorney at Wyly~Rommel, PLLC

4004 Texas Boulevard

Texarkana, TX 75503

Scott E. Poynter

Attorney at Poynter Law Group / Poynter Tucker

407 President Clinton Avenue, Suite 201

Little Rock, AR 72201

Philip Daniel Holland

Attorney at Poynter Law Group

407 President Clinton Avenue, Suite 201

Little Rock, AR 72201

Sean Fletcher Rommel

Attorney at Wyly~Rommel, PLLC

4004 Texas Boulevard

Texarkana, TX 75503

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L. Alexander

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

Michael J. Philippi

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60602

Daniel Reece Owens

Attorney at Barber Law Firm PLLC

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 3400

Little Rock, AR 72201

Seth A. Horvath

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60602

Kevin P. Shea

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60602

Eilza T. Davis

Attorney at Nixon Peabody LLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3500

Chicago, IL 60602

Robert Ryan Younger

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Megan D. Hargraves

Attorney at Mitchell, Williams, Selig, Gates & Woodyard, P.L.L.C.

425 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1800

Little Rock, AR 72201

Dean Richlin

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2600

Peter R. Shults

Attorney at Shults Law Firm LLP

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1600

Little Rock, AR 72201

Steven T. Shults

Attorney at Shults Law Firm LLP

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 1600

Little Rock, AR 72201

Kristyn Marie DeFilipp

Attorney at Foley Hoag LLP

155 Seaport Boulevard

Boston, MA 02210-2600

Samantha Brown

Attorney at The Phoenix Law Group PLC

8765 East Bell Road, Suite 101

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Camille S. Bass

Attorney at The Phoenix Law Group PLC

8765 East Bell Road, Suite 101

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Christopher J. Heller

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Regions Center, Suite 2000, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3522

17 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

43 #6

Exhibit

43 #5

Exhibit

43 #4

Exhibit

43 #3

Exhibit

43 #2

Exhibit

#43

#42

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Pharmaceutical Care Management Association (Shults, Peter) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #42 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Owens, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss by Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION to Seal Exhibits and Redact Sections of Caremark's Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss under Federal Arbitration Act by Arkansas CVS Pharmacy LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Caremark LLC, CaremarkPCS LLC (Owens, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #39 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, SEPARATE DEFENDANTS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS filed by OptumRx Inc, OptumRx Pharmacy Inc. (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM SEPARATE DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by OptumRx Inc, OptumRx Pharmacy Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Pharmacy Network Agreement (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Joshua Van Ginkel)(Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, ESI Mail Processing Inc, Express Scripts, Express Scripts Pharmacy (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #35 Motion to Dismiss, Defendants' Joint Brief in Support of Their Motions to Dismiss filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, ESI Mail Processing Inc, Express Scripts, Express Scripts Pharmacy. (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #35 Motion to Dismiss, filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, ESI Mail Processing Inc, Express Scripts, Express Scripts Pharmacy. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Stacy)(Younger, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Michael B. Kimberly. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3906596. Filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service Inc, ESI Mail Processing Inc, Express Scripts, Express Scripts Pharmacy (Younger, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #4 and #5 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice. Camille Bass and Samantha Brown are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/6/2021. (ljb) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign a Magistrate Judge to this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/4/2021. (ljb) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Extend Time to respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/4/2021. (sjh) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by OptumRx Inc, OptumRx Pharmacy Inc (Pruitt, Lyn) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Samantha Brown. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3900308. Filed by MedImpact Direct LLC, MedImpact Healthcare Systems Inc (Heller, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Camille Bass. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3900286. Filed by MedImpact Direct LLC, MedImpact Healthcare Systems Inc (Heller, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Heller on behalf of MedImpact Direct LLC, MedImpact Healthcare Systems Inc (Heller, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Lackie Drug Store Inc.(ajt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Lonoke County Circuit Court, case number 43CV-20-752. Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT080277. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pharmaceutical Care Management Association is a litigant

Latest cases where ESI MAIL PHARMACY SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medimpact Healthcare Systems Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CAREMARKPCS, L.L.C. is a litigant